Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3127152

EP3127152 - STRESS MITIGATION STRUCTURE FOR WAFER WARPAGE REDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Database last updated on 19.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
International IP Administration
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2017/06]
Inventor(s)01 / LAN, Je-Hsiung Jeffrey
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / BERDY, David Francis
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / ZUO, Chengjie
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / KIM, Daeik Daniel
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
05 / YUN, Changhan Hobie
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
06 / VELEZ, Mario Francisco
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
07 / MUDAKATTE, Niranjan Sunil
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
08 / MIKULKA, Robert Paul
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
09 / KIM, Jonghae
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/06]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/06]
Application number, filing date15722367.825.03.2015
[2017/06]
WO2015US22538
Priority number, dateUS201461975570P04.04.2014         Original published format: US 201461975570 P
US20141448394411.09.2014         Original published format: US201414483944
[2017/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015153229
Date:08.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3127152
Date:08.02.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015
[2017/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01L23/522, H01L23/528, H01L27/01, H01L49/02
[2017/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/06]
TitleGerman:BEANSPRUCHUNGSABSCHWÄCHUNGSSTRUKTUR ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER WAFER-SCHRUMPFUNG[2017/06]
English:STRESS MITIGATION STRUCTURE FOR WAFER WARPAGE REDUCTION[2017/06]
French:STRUCTURE D'ATTÉNUATION DE CONTRAINTE POUR RÉDUCTION DE GAUCHISSEMENT DE PLAQUETTE[2017/06]
Entry into regional phase26.08.2016National basic fee paid 
26.08.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.01.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.08.2016Examination requested  [2017/06]
26.08.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
08.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2007141800  (KURIHARA KAZUAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,14 * figures 3A, 3B * [I] 2,6,15-19;
 [XI]US2010301452  (WANG JAMES JEN-HO [US]) [X] 1,14 * figure 9 * [I] 2,6,15,19;
 [A]US6577011  (BUCHWALTER LEENA P [US], et al) [A] 7 * figure 3 *