Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3137663

EP3137663 - MICRO-PERFORATED REFLECTIVE TEXTILE SLEEVE AND METHOD OF CONSTRUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Federal-Mogul Powertrain LLC
27300 West Eleven Mile Road
Southfield, MI 48034 / US
[2018/20]
Former [2017/10]For all designated states
Federal-Mogul Powertrain LLC
27300 West 11 Mile Road
Southfield, MI 48034 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Ming-ming
1057 Ballentree Lane
West Chester, PA 19382 / US
02 / HO, Wai, Kit
15623 Marberry Drive
Cypress, TX 77429 / US
[N/P]
Former [2017/10]01 / CHEN, Ming-ming
1057 Ballentree Lane
West Chester, PA 19382 / US
02 / HO, Wai, Kit
178 Shoen Road
Exton, PA 19341 / US
Representative(s)HGF Limited
4th Floor
Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/10]Lessard, Jason Donat , et al
HGF Limited
4th Floor, Merchant Exchange
17-19 Withworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
Application number, filing date15722395.901.05.2015
[2017/10]
WO2015US28768
Priority number, dateUS201461987299P01.05.2014         Original published format: US 201461987299 P
[2017/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015168535
Date:05.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3137663
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015
[2017/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:D03D1/00, B32B5/24, B32B5/28, B60R16/02, B32B38/04
[2017/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/10]
TitleGerman:MIKROPERFORIERTE RÜCKSTRAHLENDE TEXTILHÜLLE UND KONSTRUKTIONSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2017/10]
English:MICRO-PERFORATED REFLECTIVE TEXTILE SLEEVE AND METHOD OF CONSTRUCTION THEREOF[2017/10]
French:MANCHON TEXTILE RÉFLÉCHISSANT MICRO-PERFORÉ, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE CONSTRUCTION[2017/10]
Entry into regional phase03.11.2016National basic fee paid 
03.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/10]
03.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
07.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
08.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP1687561  (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR]) [X] 1,2,6,8,9,12,13,15,16,20,22,26,27 * paragraphs [0038] , [0058] , [0061] , [0062]; figure 1; claim 1 * [I] 7,10,11,14,21,24,25,28;
 [X]WO2010030298  (ALBANY INT CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-5,15-19 * page 12, line 20 - page 13, line 14; figure 5; claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0025691  (RAYCHEM SA NV [BE]) [X] 1,6,9,15,20,23 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraphs 3,4 * * page 3, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 4, paragraph 2; figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2011275268  (HARRIS DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * paragraphs [0049] - [0055]; figures 1-8 *