Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3160308

EP3160308 - MACHINE FOR PREPARING BEVERAGES WITH FROTHED MILK, IN PARTICULAR CAPPUCCINO OR LATTE MACCHIATO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.07.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.03.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  24.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Illycaffe' S.p.A.
Via Flavia 110
34147 Trieste / IT
[2017/18]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN EEDEN, Franciscus Benedictus Maria
Via di Basovizza 15
34151 Trieste / IT
02 / GIACHIN, Claudio
Via Cadorna 21
34123 Trieste / IT
03 / DELLAPIETRA, Bruno
Via Sistiana 104
34011 Duino-aurisina / IT
04 / BALESTIER, Diego
Piazza Cornelia Romana 2
34124 Trieste / IT
 [2017/18]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2017/18]
Application number, filing date15722721.614.05.2015
[2017/18]
WO2015EP60729
Priority number, dateIT2014MI0117127.06.2014         Original published format: IT MI20141171
[2017/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015197261
Date:30.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3160308
Date:03.05.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2015
[2017/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/44, A47J31/40, A47J31/46
[2019/26]
Former International [2017/18]A47J31/44
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/18]
TitleGerman:MASCHINE ZUM ZUBEREITEN VON GETRÄNKEN MIT MILCHSCHAUM, INSBESONDERE CAPPUCCINO ODER MILCHKAFFEE[2017/18]
English:MACHINE FOR PREPARING BEVERAGES WITH FROTHED MILK, IN PARTICULAR CAPPUCCINO OR LATTE MACCHIATO[2017/18]
French:MACHINE DE PRÉPARATION DE BOISSONS AVEC MOUSSE DE LAIT, EN PARTICULIER CAPPUCCINO OU MACCHIATO LATTE[2017/18]
Entry into regional phase24.01.2017National basic fee paid 
24.01.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
24.01.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/18]
24.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
09.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201905   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO2011064702  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-8,17,19,20 * page 3, line 33 - page 9, line 12; figures 1-9 * [A] 9-16,18;
 [A]WO2011015963  (SAECO STRATEGIC SERVICES LTD [IE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 6, line 32 - page 15, line 15; figures 1-22 *;
 [A]EP2225976  (DELICA AG [CH]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-10 *