Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3137641 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3137641



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1858
16.07.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.07.2024 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
16.07.2024 French translation of claims Opposition 2
16.07.2024 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
16.07.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
04.06.2024 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
04.06.2024 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 4
04.06.2024 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 4
04.06.2024 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 4
27.05.2024 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
16.05.2024 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 19
16.05.2024 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 20
16.05.2024 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 20
16.05.2024 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 20
26.03.2024 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
26.03.2024 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
26.03.2024 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
26.03.2024 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
27.02.2024 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
27.02.2024 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
27.02.2024 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
22.02.2024 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
21.02.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.02.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.02.2024 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
19.02.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.02.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.02.2024 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
15.02.2024 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
15.02.2024 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 7
12.02.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.02.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.02.2024 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
19.01.2024 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 40
19.01.2024 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 40
15.01.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.01.2024 Citation in appeal procedure - 022 Appeal 28
15.01.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.01.2024 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
09.01.2024 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
09.01.2024 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
04.01.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.01.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.01.2024 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
05.12.2023 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 8
05.12.2023 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 8
05.12.2023 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 8
17.10.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
17.10.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
12.10.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.10.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.10.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.08.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.08.2023 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 2
12.07.2023 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
12.07.2023 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
12.07.2023 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
07.07.2023 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
07.07.2023 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
24.01.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 14
24.01.2023 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 14
19.01.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.01.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.01.2023 Reply to appeal Appeal 11
12.09.2022 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.09.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.09.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.09.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.09.2022 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 66
07.09.2022 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
07.09.2022 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 15
16.08.2022 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
13.07.2022 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
13.07.2022 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 7
13.07.2022 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 7
06.07.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.07.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
06.07.2022 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
18.05.2022 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.05.2022 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.05.2022 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.05.2022 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
11.05.2022 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
11.05.2022 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 15
11.05.2022 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 14
11.05.2022 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
11.05.2022 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
11.05.2022 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
11.05.2022 Means of redress Opposition 2
11.05.2022 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2022 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
11.05.2022 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
11.05.2022 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.05.2022 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.05.2022 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.05.2022 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.05.2022 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 42
11.05.2022 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 42
11.05.2022 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 42
22.02.2022 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.01.2022 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
27.01.2022 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
24.01.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.01.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.01.2022 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.01.2022 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 17
04.01.2022 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 17
23.12.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
23.12.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
23.12.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 9
23.12.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
23.12.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
23.12.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 9
22.12.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.12.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.12.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.12.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.12.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 Opposition 2
22.12.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 Opposition 2
22.12.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 Opposition 2
22.12.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 021 Opposition 15
22.12.2021 Consolidated list of cited opposition documents Opposition 1
22.12.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
22.12.2021 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
20.12.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.12.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 019 Opposition 24
20.12.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 020 Opposition 26
20.12.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
20.12.2021 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
16.12.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.12.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 017 Opposition 26
16.12.2021 Citation in opposition procedure - 018 Opposition 5
16.12.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
16.12.2021 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.12.2021 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
07.12.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.12.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
03.12.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
03.12.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
03.12.2021 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
03.12.2021 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
03.12.2021 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
22.07.2021 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 2
02.06.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.06.2021 Annexes in respect of a client data request Opposition 1
02.06.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
02.06.2021 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (proprietor) Opposition 1
01.06.2021 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.05.2021 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Opposition 2
26.05.2021 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.05.2021 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.05.2021 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 9
20.05.2021 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
20.05.2021 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.05.2021 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.05.2021 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.05.2021 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 14
20.05.2021 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 14
20.05.2021 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 14
17.05.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.05.2021 Annexes in respect of a client data request Opposition 23
17.05.2021 Annexes in respect of a client data request Opposition 3
17.05.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
17.05.2021 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (proprietor) Opposition 1
26.02.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 29
26.02.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 29
23.02.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
23.02.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.02.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.02.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.02.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 Opposition 2
23.02.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 Opposition 2
23.02.2021 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 Opposition 2
23.02.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
23.02.2021 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 14
23.10.2020 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
23.10.2020 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 17
23.10.2020 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 19
15.10.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.10.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
15.10.2020 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
14.10.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
13.10.2020 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 15
13.10.2020 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 18
07.10.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
07.10.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 007 Opposition 3
07.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 008 Opposition 7
07.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 009 Opposition 39
07.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 010 Opposition 14
07.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 011 Opposition 8
07.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 012 Opposition 5
07.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 013 Opposition 42
07.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 014 Opposition 1
07.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 015 Opposition 6
07.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 016 Opposition 24
07.10.2020 General authorisation Opposition 1
07.10.2020 General authorisation Opposition 1
07.10.2020 General authorisation Opposition 1
07.10.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
07.10.2020 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
07.10.2020 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
07.10.2020 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
07.10.2020 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
06.10.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 001 Opposition 1
06.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 002 Opposition 29
06.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 003 Opposition 23
06.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 004 Opposition 8
06.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 005 Opposition 5
06.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 005 Opposition 1
06.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 005 Opposition 1
06.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 005 Opposition 1
06.10.2020 Citation in opposition procedure - 006 Opposition 7
06.10.2020 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
06.10.2020 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
18.09.2020 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.09.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.09.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.09.2020 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
20.01.2020 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
12.12.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.11.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
28.11.2019 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
28.11.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
28.11.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 16
28.11.2019 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 16
15.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.11.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
15.11.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
15.11.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
15.11.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
15.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.11.2019 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
08.07.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
08.07.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
08.07.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
08.07.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 16
08.07.2019 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 16
06.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.06.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
06.06.2019 Description Search / examination 5
06.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.06.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.05.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
20.05.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.05.2019 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
02.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
02.05.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
02.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.05.2019 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
22.02.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 2
12.07.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
12.07.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.07.2018 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
13.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
13.06.2018 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
13.06.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
13.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.06.2018 Request for further processing Search / examination 3
06.04.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 2
05.01.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
22.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.12.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.08.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
29.08.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.08.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
19.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.06.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
19.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
19.06.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
19.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.04.2017 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.02.2017 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.01.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
22.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.12.2016 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 106
22.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.12.2016 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 1
09.12.2016 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
05.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.11.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
24.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.10.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
09.09.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
23.11.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 20
05.11.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
05.11.2015 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 19
05.11.2015 Published international application - A1 Opposition 19
29.07.2015 Annex International Searching Authority 2
16.07.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII International Searching Authority 2
16.07.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet International Searching Authority 1
16.07.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box International Searching Authority 3
15.05.2015 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
15.05.2015 Annex International Searching Authority 3
15.05.2015 Claims International Searching Authority 3
15.05.2015 Description International Searching Authority 5
15.05.2015 Drawings International Searching Authority 9
15.05.2015 Submission concerning representation International Searching Authority 1