Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3146758

EP3146758 - DEVICES AND METHODS FOR FACILITATING UPLINK TRANSMISSIONS ON TWO OR MORE CARRIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.12.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SM
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2019/06]
Former [2017/13]For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KANAMARLAPUDI, Sitaramanjaneyulu
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / HSU, Liangchi
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/13]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/13]
Application number, filing date15723598.730.04.2015
[2017/13]
WO2015US28449
Priority number, dateUS201462002123P22.05.2014         Original published format: US 201462002123 P
US20151462441317.02.2015         Original published format: US201514624413
[2017/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015179096
Date:26.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3146758
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2015
[2017/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3146758
Date:06.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W28/08, H04W28/02
[2018/35]
Former International [2017/13]H04W28/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERLEICHTERUNG VON UPLINK-ÜBERTRAGUNGEN AUF ZWEI ODER MEHR TRÄGERN[2017/13]
English:DEVICES AND METHODS FOR FACILITATING UPLINK TRANSMISSIONS ON TWO OR MORE CARRIERS[2017/13]
French:DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS DE FACILITATION DE TRANSMISSIONS EN LIAISON MONTANTE SUR DEUX PORTEUSES OU PLUS[2017/13]
Entry into regional phase24.10.2016National basic fee paid 
24.10.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
24.10.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.10.2016Examination requested  [2017/13]
24.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2018Fee for grant paid
13.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
09.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL06.02.2019
CZ06.02.2019
DK06.02.2019
EE06.02.2019
ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RO06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
SK06.02.2019
SM06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/49]AL06.02.2019
CZ06.02.2019
DK06.02.2019
EE06.02.2019
ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RO06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
SK06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/48]DK06.02.2019
ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/47]ES06.02.2019
FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Cited inInternational search[X]US2013132604  (COHEN ETAN GUR [US], et al) [X] 1-28 * figures 2, 3, 4; claim 1 *;
 [A]US7826370  (VARGANTWAR SACHIN R [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * claim 1 *
ExaminationUS2010272078