Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3137199

EP3137199 - POROUS ASYMMETRIC POLYPHENYLENE ETHER MEMBRANES AND ASSOCIATED SEPARATION MODULES AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
[N/P]
Former [2017/10]For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BERZINIS, Albin Peter
1 Noryl Avenue
Selkirk, New York 12158 / US
02 / BAJAJ, Pooja
1 Noryl Avenue
Selkirk, New York 12158 / US
03 / HALBFINGER, Rachel Elizabeth
1 Noryl Avenue
Selkirk, New York 12158 / US
04 / BIKEL, Matias
Plasticslaan 1
NL-4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
 [2017/10]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2017/10]
Application number, filing date15723601.930.04.2015
[2017/10]
WO2015US28546
Priority number, dateUS201461987389P01.05.2014         Original published format: US 201461987389 P
[2017/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015168423
Date:05.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3137199
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015
[2017/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:B01D67/00, B01D69/02, B01D71/52, B01D71/76, B01D71/78, B01D71/80
[2017/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/10]
TitleGerman:ASYMMETRISCHE PORÖSE POLYPHENYLENETHERMEMBRANEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE TRENNMODULE UND VERFAHREN[2017/10]
English:POROUS ASYMMETRIC POLYPHENYLENE ETHER MEMBRANES AND ASSOCIATED SEPARATION MODULES AND METHODS[2017/10]
French:MEMBRANES ASYMÉTRIQUES POREUSES DE POLYPHÉNYLÈNE ÉTHER ET MODULES ET PROCÉDÉS DE SÉPARATION ASSOCIÉS[2017/10]
Entry into regional phase14.11.2016National basic fee paid 
14.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/10]
14.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XYI]EP1918019  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1,4-6,9-19 * preparation ex. 1;; examples 1,6-8 * [Y] 2,3 [I] 7,8;
 [XYI]US2008207822  (YEAGER GARY WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-10,13,17 * paragraphs [0082] , [0111] , [0120]; examples 18,17,22,21 * [Y] 2,3 [I] 6,7,11,12,14-16,18,19;
 [A]CN103007787  (SHAOXING REEYEE ENVIRONMENTAL PROT TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 6,7 * Summary of invention *
 [A]  - ULBRICHT ET AL, "Advanced functional polymer membranes", POLYMER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, vol. 47, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.POLYMER.2006.01.084, ISSN 0032-3861, (20060322), pages 2217 - 2262, (20060322), XP028060832 [A] 6,7 * 4.2.2. Focus on surface properties *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymer.2006.01.084