Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3146381

EP3146381 - HINGE DEVICE FOR EYEGLASSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.11.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Luxottica S.r.l.
Via Valcozzena, 10
32021 Agordo / IT
[2017/13]
Inventor(s)01 / SACCARDO, Roberto
Via Lamarmora 35
I-36100 Vicenza / IT
 [2017/13]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2017/13]
Application number, filing date15724204.113.05.2015
[2017/13]
WO2015EP60652
Priority number, dateIT2014MI0092321.05.2014         Original published format: IT MI20140923
[2017/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015177033
Date:26.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3146381
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2015
[2017/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:G02C5/10, G02C5/22
[2017/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/13]
TitleGerman:SCHARNIERVORRICHTUNG FÜR BRILLEN[2017/13]
English:HINGE DEVICE FOR EYEGLASSES[2017/13]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CHARNIÈRE POUR DES LUNETTES[2017/13]
Entry into regional phase01.12.2016National basic fee paid 
01.12.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/13]
01.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.11.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
18.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XAI]GB1003661  (NATIONALE SA) [X] 1,7,8,10,11 * page 2, line 107 - page 3, line 4; figure 5 * [A] 3 [I] 6,9;
 [XAI]US3427681  (SMITH MORRIS G JR) [X] 1,8,10,11 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 2; figure 1 * [A] 3 [I] 6,9;
 [XAI]WO2005111701  (SAFILO SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1,7,8,10,11 * page 3, line 8 - page 5, line 19; figures 4a, 4b * [A] 3 [I] 6,9;
 [XI]GB463491  (WILLESDEN OPTICAL WORKS LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,10,11 * the whole document * [I] 6,9;
 [XAI]DE102006016297  (IC BERLIN BRILLEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8,10,11 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-5 * [A] 3 [I] 6,9;
 [XAI]DE202011051139U  (HOU MEI YUEH [TW]) [X] 1,8,10,11 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0032]; figures 5a-d, 6 * [A] 3 [I] 6,9