Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3137059

EP3137059 - METHOD FOR MAKING BISMUTH-CONTAINING LIQUID PHARMACEUTICAL SUSPENSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.03.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.01.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2018/21]
Former [2017/10]For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GILBERT, Steven, Ray
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
02 / FITCH, Edward, Paul, V
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
03 / HO, Derrick
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
04 / WHITE JR, Daniel Jerome.
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
05 / TUNIS, Adam Michael.
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
 [2017/10]
Representative(s)Töpert, Verena Clarita
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[2018/21]
Former [2017/10]Sauvaître, Thibault Bruno
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Patent Department
PO Box 14
Frankfurter Straße 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date15724823.829.04.2015
[2017/10]
WO2015US28215
Priority number, dateUS201461985653P29.04.2014         Original published format: US 201461985653 P
[2017/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015168241
Date:05.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3137059
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015
[2017/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3137059
Date:23.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/10, A61K47/02, A61K47/36, A61K47/38, A61K31/29
[2017/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/10]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WISMUTHALTIGEN FLÜSSIGEN PHARMAZEUTISCHEN SUSPENSIONEN[2017/10]
English:METHOD FOR MAKING BISMUTH-CONTAINING LIQUID PHARMACEUTICAL SUSPENSIONS[2017/10]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE SUSPENSIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES LIQUIDES CONTENANT DU BISMUTH[2017/10]
Entry into regional phase15.09.2016National basic fee paid 
15.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/10]
15.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2018Fee for grant paid
04.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)26.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL23.05.2018
AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
[2020/02]
Former [2019/51]AL23.05.2018
AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2018/52]FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
GR24.08.2018
Former [2018/51]FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/50]FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/49]FI23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
SE23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/47]FI23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
NO23.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]WO0010527  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-9 * example 6 * * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US4801454  (COVENEY LEILA D [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 3, lines 30-63 * * column 6; examples 1,11 * * claims 1,2,8,9 *;
 [A]WO03066022  (PHARMACIA CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * example 2 * * claims 1,3,7,8 *;
 [A]EP1488812  (MEDRX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * table 9 * * claims 1,11 *
by applicantUS6712496