Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3137059 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3137059



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 184
29.03.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
04.06.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
26.04.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.04.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
04.04.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
04.04.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
07.02.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.02.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
03.01.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
03.01.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
03.01.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
03.01.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
03.01.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 19
14.11.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
30.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.05.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
30.05.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
30.05.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
30.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.03.2017 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
09.03.2017 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
16.02.2017 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
08.02.2017 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
06.12.2016 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
02.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.11.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
22.09.2016 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
22.09.2016 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
22.09.2016 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
22.09.2016 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
15.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.09.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
09.09.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
23.11.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 36
05.11.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
05.11.2015 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 20
10.07.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
10.07.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
10.07.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
18.05.2015 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
18.05.2015 Annex International Searching Authority 3
18.05.2015 Claims International Searching Authority 2
18.05.2015 Description International Searching Authority 15
18.05.2015 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
18.05.2015 Drawings International Searching Authority 2