Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3137059


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
06.12.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.01.2020  [2020/02]
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019  [2019/51]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
29.03.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  01.05.2019  [2019/18]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
02.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
20.04.2018 (Expected) grant published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
13.04.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.04.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
09.04.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
07.04.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
02.01.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.06.2017 Change: Validation states published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
30.06.2017 Change - extension states published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
31.05.2017 Amendment by applicant
12.04.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.03.2017 Change - representative
17.02.2017 Change - representative
03.02.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
03.02.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
03.02.2017 Request for examination filed published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
09.01.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
12.10.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
23.09.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
16.09.2016 Change - representative
16.09.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
13.11.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
06.11.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
08.06.2015 PCT data prior to European publication