Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3139880

EP3139880 - DISRUPTIVE DRESSING FOR USE WITH NEGATIVE PRESSURE AND FLUID INSTILLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.10.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265 / US
[2017/31]
Former [2017/11]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
12930 IH-10 West
San Antonio, TX 78249-2248 / US
Inventor(s)01 / INGRAM, Shannon C.
30155 Bridlegate Drive
Bulverde, TX 78163 / US
02 / LOCKE, Christopher Brian
6 Bosworth Mews
Bournemouth
Dorset BH9 3SD / GB
03 / ARNOLD, Peter
Elmgrove Tynedale
E Villas
Hexham
Northumberland NE46 3JF / GB
04 / ROBINSON, Timothy Mark
27 Wellington Terrace
Basingstoke
Hampshire RG23 8HH / GB
05 / CARROLL, Christopher A.
12930 Ih 10 West
San Antonio, TX 78249 / US
06 / MANWARING, Michael E.
16703 Weyburn
San Antonio, TX 78248 / US
 [2017/11]
Representative(s)Cordina, Kevin John
Simmons & Simmons LLP
CityPoint
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/12]CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
Former [2017/11]Cordina, Kevin John
Olswang LLP
90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
Application number, filing date15724881.608.05.2015
[2017/11]
WO2015US30030
Priority number, dateUS201461991150P09.05.2014         Original published format: US 201461991150 P
US201461991134P09.05.2014         Original published format: US 201461991134 P
US201461991174P09.05.2014         Original published format: US 201461991174 P
[2017/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015172111
Date:12.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3139880
Date:15.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2015
[2017/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3139880
Date:21.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/00, A61M1/00, A61M27/00, A61B17/32
[2017/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/11]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:ABLÖSUNGSVERBAND ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT UNTERDRUCK- UND FLUIDINSTILLATION[2017/11]
English:DISRUPTIVE DRESSING FOR USE WITH NEGATIVE PRESSURE AND FLUID INSTILLATION[2017/11]
French:PANSEMENT À EFFET PERTURBATEUR DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ EN PRESSION NÉGATIVE ET AVEC INSTILLATION DE FLUIDE[2017/11]
Entry into regional phase09.12.2016National basic fee paid 
09.12.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/11]
09.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2018Fee for grant paid
08.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18162504.7  / EP3354241
Opposition(s)02.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SI21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
IE08.05.2018
LU08.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/24]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
IE08.05.2018
LU08.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/19]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
IE08.05.2018
LU08.05.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/17]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
LU08.05.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/06]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2018/52]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/50]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/47]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/46]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/40]CY21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/37]CY21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/35]CY21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
NO21.06.2018
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2008005532  (BOEHRINGER LAB INC [US], et al) [I] 44-93,127,128 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-9 *;
 [I]US2010063484  (HEAGLE DAVID G [US]) [I] 44,78 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-2d *;
 [XI]WO2014014922  (SMITH & NEPHEW INC [US], et al) [X] 44,128 * abstract * [I] 78;
 [IA]US2014066868  (FREEDMAN BRETT A [US], et al) [I] 127 * paragraph [0077]; figures 1a-l * * paragraph [0094] * [A] 105;
 [A]US2010160871  (SEEGERT CHARLES ALAN [US], et al) [A] 44,78,105 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-5b * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] *;
 [A]US2011213319  (BLOTT PATRICK LEWIS [GB], et al) [A] 44,78,105 * abstract *;
 [A]US2009093779  (RIESINGER BIRGIT [DE]) [A] 44,78,105 * paragraph [0029]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0055] *;
 [A]US2002065494  (LOCKWOOD JEFFREY S [US], et al) [A] 44,78,105 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-15 *;
 [A]US2010185163  (HEAGLE DAVID G [US]) [A] 44,78,105 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-2b *