Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3142570

EP3142570 - HUMERAL CUT GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  12.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, IN 46582 / US
[2017/12]
Inventor(s)01 / KEHRES, Clinton E.
501 Barrington Place
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
02 / EASH, Christopher
3365W 525N
Albion, Indiana 46701 / US
03 / MILLER, Kevin
64182 County Road 3
Wakarusa, Indiana 46573 / US
 [2017/12]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2017/12]
Application number, filing date15724885.711.05.2015
[2017/12]
WO2015US30124
Priority number, dateUS20141427557712.05.2014         Original published format: US201414275577
[2017/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015175397
Date:19.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3142570
Date:22.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2015
[2017/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/15, A61B17/17
[2017/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/12]
TitleGerman:HUMERUSSCHNITTFÜHRUNG[2017/12]
English:HUMERAL CUT GUIDE[2017/12]
French:GUIDE DE COUPE HUMÉRALE[2017/12]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2016National basic fee paid 
12.12.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/12]
12.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2012021241  (SMITH & NEPHEW INC [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0180] - [0187]; figures 9-28 *;
 [A]EP2724675  (ASTON MEDICAL [FR]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0012] , [0042] - [0044]; figures 1,4,7 *;
 [A]US2009270875  (PONCET DIDIER [FR]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0081] - [0084]; figures 1-9 *;
 [A]US2010049260  (LONG JACK F [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0096] - [0097]; figures 17-19 *