Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3143398

EP3143398 - SELECTIVE ANALYSIS OF MODIFIED BIOLOGICAL MOLECULES WITH SOLID-STATE NANOPORES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wake Forest University Health Sciences
391 Technology Way, Suite 199
Winston-Salem NC 27101 / US
[2017/12]
Inventor(s)01 / HALL, Adam, R.
1720 Curraghmore Road
Clemmons, NC 27012 / US
 [2017/12]
Representative(s)Phillips & Leigh LLP
Temple Chambers
3-7 Temple Avenue
London EC4Y 0DA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/12]Phillips & Leigh
5 Pemberton Row
London EC4A 3BA / GB
Application number, filing date15724906.113.05.2015
[2017/12]
WO2015US30531
Priority number, dateUS201461992814P13.05.2014         Original published format: US 201461992814 P
US201562132989P13.03.2015         Original published format: US 201562132989 P
[2017/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015175638
Date:19.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3143398
Date:22.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2015
[2017/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/487
[2017/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/12]
TitleGerman:SELEKTIVE ANALYSE VON MODIFIZIERTEN BIOLOGISCHEN MOLEKÜLEN MIT FESTKÖRPERNANOPOREN[2017/12]
English:SELECTIVE ANALYSIS OF MODIFIED BIOLOGICAL MOLECULES WITH SOLID-STATE NANOPORES[2017/12]
French:ANALYSE SÉLECTIVE DE MOLÉCULES BIOLOGIQUES MODIFIÉES AVEC DES NANOPORES À L'ÉTAT SOLIDE[2017/12]
Entry into regional phase08.12.2016National basic fee paid 
08.12.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/12]
08.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.08.2017Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
Request for further processing for:Loss of rights: Claims
16.08.2017Request for further processing filed
16.08.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.09.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XYI]  - MENI WANUNU ET AL, "Nanopore Analysis of Individual RNA/Antibiotic Complexes", ACS NANO, (20111227), vol. 5, no. 12, doi:10.1021/nn203764j, ISSN 1936-0851, pages 9345 - 9353, XP055201578 [X] 1,2,6-8,17 * abstract * * page 9346, column left, paragraph 3 - column right, paragraph 1 * * page 9347, column left, paragraph 2 - page 9348, column left, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 3-5,9-14 [I] 15,16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nn203764j
 [XI]  - LARKIN JOSEPH ET AL, "High-Bandwidth Protein Analysis Using Solid-State Nanopores", BIOPHYSICAL JOURNAL, (20140228), vol. 106, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.BPJ.2013.12.025, ISSN 0006-3495, pages 696 - 704, XP028606798 [X] 1,2,6-8,15 * abstract * * page 701, column right, paragraph 1 - page 702, column right, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,6 * [I] 16,17

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bpj.2013.12.025
 [Y]  - DAVID J. NIEDZWIECKI ET AL, "Sampling a Biomarker of the Human Immunodeficiency Virus across a Synthetic Nanopore", ACS NANO, (20130423), vol. 7, no. 4, doi:10.1021/nn400125c, ISSN 1936-0851, pages 3341 - 3350, XP055201569 [Y] 3-5 * abstract * * page 3342, column right, paragraph 2 - page 3344, column left, paragraph 1 * * page 3346, column left, paragraph 2 - page 3347, column left, paragraph 1 * * figures 3,5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nn400125c
 [Y]  - JOHN CHU ET AL, "Real-Time Monitoring of DNA Polymerase Function and Stepwise Single-Nucleotide DNA Strand Translocation through a Protein Nanopore", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE (INTERNATIONAL ED. IN ENGLISH), (20101123), vol. 122, no. 52, doi:10.1002/ange.201005460, ISSN 0044-8249, pages 10304 - 10307, XP055148678 [Y] 9-13 * page 10304, column right, paragraph 2 - page 10305, column right, paragraph 1 * * page 10306, column left, paragraph 1 - page 10307, column left, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ange.201005460
 [Y]  - MENI WANUNU ET AL, "Electrostatic focusing of unlabelled DNA into nanoscale pores using a salt gradient", NATURE NANOTECHNOLOGY, (20091220), vol. 5, no. 2, doi:10.1038/nnano.2009.379, ISSN 1748-3387, pages 160 - 165, XP055134839 [Y] 14 * abstract * * page 161, column right, paragraph 2 - page 162, column right, paragraph 2 * * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nnano.2009.379
by applicantWO2012170499