blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3141085

EP3141085 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR COLOR MIXING VIA ANGULAR LIGHT OUTPUT MODIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.08.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 17.01.2018  [2018/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Philips Lighting Holding B.V.
High Tech Campus 45
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2017/11]
Inventor(s)01 / ROTH, Eric Anthony
c/o High Tech Campus 45
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2017/34]
Former [2017/11]01 / ROTH, Eric Anthony
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Representative(s)Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle
Signify Netherlands B.V.
Intellectual Property
High Tech Campus 7
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2017/11]Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle
Philips Lighting B.V.
Philips Lighting Intellectual Property
High Tech Campus 45
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date15725118.223.04.2015
[2017/11]
WO2015IB52962
Priority number, dateUS201461989304P06.05.2014         Original published format: US 201461989304 P
[2017/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2015170214
Date:12.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3141085
Date:15.03.2017
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2017/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.2015
ClassificationIPC:H05B33/08, F21V7/04
[2017/11]
CPC:
A61N5/06 (EP,CN,US); F21V7/0091 (EP,CN,US); F21K9/62 (US);
F21V7/041 (EP,CN,US); H05B45/20 (EP,CN,US); H05B45/22 (US);
F21Y2103/10 (EP,US); F21Y2105/10 (EP,US); F21Y2105/12 (EP,US);
F21Y2113/13 (EP,US); F21Y2115/10 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/11]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FARBMISCHUNG ÜBER SCHRÄGLICHTAUSGABEÄNDERUNG[2017/11]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR COLOR MIXING VIA ANGULAR LIGHT OUTPUT MODIFICATION[2017/11]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR LE MÉLANGE DE COULEURS PAR LE BIAIS D'UNE MODIFICATION DE SORTIE DE LUMIÈRE ANGULAIRE[2017/11]
Entry into regional phase06.12.2016National basic fee paid 
06.12.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
06.12.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/11]
15.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.12.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US2013058104  (CATALANO ANTHONY [US]) [A] 1,5,9* abstract *;
 [X]US2014084809  (CATALANO ANTHONY W [US]) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0046]; figure 1 *
ExaminationWO2009142775
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.