Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3146443

EP3146443 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR GENERATING VIDEO PROGRAM EXTRACTS BASED ON SEARCH QUERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2017/45]
Former [2017/13]For all designated states
Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SKOLICKI, Zbigniew
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
 [2017/13]
Representative(s)Thorniley, Peter
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/13]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date15726482.119.05.2015
[2017/13]
WO2015US31621
Priority number, dateUS201462001007P20.05.2014         Original published format: US 201462001007 P
US20141433585118.07.2014         Original published format: US201414335851
[2017/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015179431
Date:26.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3146443
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2015
[2017/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, H04N21/00
[2017/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/13]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON VIDEOPROGRAMMEXTRAKTEN AUF BASIS VON SUCHANFRAGEN[2017/13]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR GENERATING VIDEO PROGRAM EXTRACTS BASED ON SEARCH QUERIES[2017/13]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR GÉNÉRER DES EXTRAITS DE PROGRAMME VIDÉO SUR LA BASE DE REQUÊTES DE RECHERCHE[2017/13]
Entry into regional phase29.11.2016National basic fee paid 
29.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
29.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/13]
29.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.11.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.11.2019
28.11.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[I]US2012189273  (FOLGNER MICHAEL GEORGE [US], et al) [I] 1-21 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0073]; figure 4 *;
 [A]US8122011  (GARG ASHUTOSH [US], et al) [A] 1,4,5,12,20,21 * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 61; figures 1,2A *
 [A]  - JEFFREY NICHOLS ET AL, "Summarizing sporting events using twitter", 2012 ACM INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT USER INTERFACES, IUI '12, LISBON, PT, ACM, New York, New York, US, (20120214), doi:10.1145/2166966.2166999, ISBN 978-1-45-031048-2, pages 189 - 198, XP055102710 [A] 1,12,20,21 * page 190, column r - page 193, column l; figures 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2166966.2166999