Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3146443 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3146443



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 308
13.12.2019 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
13.12.2019 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
13.12.2019 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
13.12.2019 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 8
13.12.2019 Means of redress Search / examination 2
06.12.2019 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
27.11.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.11.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
26.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.11.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
14.11.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
14.11.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.11.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
16.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.10.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
16.10.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
16.10.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
16.10.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
16.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.10.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
24.04.2019 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
16.04.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
16.04.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
16.04.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings and communication from Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.04.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
14.02.2019 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
14.02.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
03.01.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.12.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
03.07.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.10.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
02.10.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 4
02.10.2017 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 2
05.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
05.07.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
05.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
05.07.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
05.07.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
05.07.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
05.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.03.2017 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
03.01.2017 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
23.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.12.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
29.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.11.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
30.09.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
14.12.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 46
14.12.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 54
26.11.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
26.11.2015 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 42
03.08.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
03.08.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
03.08.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
04.06.2015 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
04.06.2015 Annex International Searching Authority 3
04.06.2015 Claims International Searching Authority 4
04.06.2015 Description International Searching Authority 24
04.06.2015 Drawings International Searching Authority 12