Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3146443


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.12.2019 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
02.12.2019 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
01.06.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.04.2019 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
15.02.2019 Change - representative
21.12.2018 Change - representative
01.06.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.10.2017 Change - applicant published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
21.07.2017 Change: Validation states published on  23.08.2017  [2017/34]
21.07.2017 Change - extension states published on  23.08.2017  [2017/34]
06.07.2017 Amendment by applicant
02.06.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.02.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
24.02.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
24.02.2017 Request for examination filed published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
31.01.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
23.12.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
02.12.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
30.11.2016 Change - representative
30.11.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
04.12.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
27.11.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
13.06.2015 PCT data prior to European publication