Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3134262

EP3134262 - ROTOGRAVURE PRINTING SYSTEM AND PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2017/09]ROTOGRAVURE PRINTING SYSTEM AND THE PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF
[2018/12]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.02.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.01.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Paramount International Services Ltd
Trust Company Complex
Ajeltake road
96 960 Majuro / MH
[2017/09]
Inventor(s)01 / IOANNOU, Ioannis
Harilaou Trikoupi 46
Attikis
GR-14574 Rodopoli / GR
 [2017/09]
Representative(s)Nollen, Maarten Dirk-Johan
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[2017/09]
Application number, filing date15727313.727.04.2015
[2017/09]
WO2015EP59093
Priority number, dateGR2014010024225.04.2014         Original published format: GR 20140100242
WO2015EP5453604.03.2015         Original published format: PCT/EP2015/054536
[2017/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015162299
Date:29.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3134262
Date:01.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2015
[2017/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3134262
Date:03.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:B41F13/11, B41F13/20, B41N1/20, B41N3/00, B41F9/00
[2018/12]
Former International [2017/09]B41F13/11, B41F13/20, B41N1/20, B41N3/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROTATIONSTIEFDRUCKSYSTEM UND HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON[2017/09]
English:ROTOGRAVURE PRINTING SYSTEM AND PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF[2018/12]
French:SYSTÈME D'IMPRESSION PAR ROTOGRAVURE, SA PRÉPARATION ET SON UTILISATION[2017/09]
Former [2017/09]ROTOGRAVURE PRINTING SYSTEM AND THE PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF
Entry into regional phase18.11.2016National basic fee paid 
18.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/09]
18.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2018Fee for grant paid
05.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)04.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201703   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2017
30.04.201804   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2018
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SI03.10.2018
SK03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/40]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SK03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/37]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
SM03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/34]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
DK03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/25]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/22]CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
NO03.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL03.10.2018
Cited inInternational search[XYI]DE667594  (STANDARD PROCESS CORP) [X] 1-3,7-12,17,20-22,24-26,30,32 * page 1, lines 1-6,17-28,45-47 * * page 1, line 56 - page 2, line 5 * * page 2, lines 22-53 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 23 [I] 4-6,13-16,18,19,27-29,31,33;
 [XYI]FR1275904  (ENZO SASSI) [X] 1-3,7-12,20-22,25,32 * page 1 - page 2 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 23 [I] 4-6,13-16,18,19,27-29,31,33;
 [XYI]US4044678  (RASMUSSEN CLAUS LOWE) [X] 1-3,7-12,17,20-22,24-26,30,32 * abstract * * column 1, lines 7-17,51-54 * * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 13 * * column 2, lines 32-39,57-63 * * columns 3-5 * * column 6, lines 48-63 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 23 [I] 4-6,13-16,18,19,27-29,31,33;
 [Y]US2949852  (SCHAEFER JOHN J) [Y] 23 * column 1, line 70 - column 4, line 71 * * figures 1-9 *
by applicantUS3294889
 EP0038385
 WO2013EP71195
 WO2013EP67895
 WO2013EP50228
 EP20120187941