Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3151760

EP3151760 - PATIENT-SPECIFIC GLENOID DEPTH CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, IN 46582 / US
[2017/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KEHRES, Clinton E.
501 Barrington Place
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
02 / WINSLOW, Nathan A.
2677 Lake Tahoe Trail
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
 [2017/15]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2017/15]
Application number, filing date15728733.502.06.2015
[2017/15]
WO2015US33756
Priority number, dateUS20141429502103.06.2014         Original published format: US201414295021
US20151468232509.04.2015         Original published format: US201514682325
[2017/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015187676
Date:10.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3151760
Date:12.04.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2015
[2017/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/16, A61B17/17, A61B34/00, A61F2/46
[2017/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/15]
TitleGerman:PATIENTENSPEZIFISCHE GLENOIDTIEFENKONTROLLE[2017/15]
English:PATIENT-SPECIFIC GLENOID DEPTH CONTROL[2017/15]
French:CONTRÔLE DE PROFONDEUR DE GLÉNOÏDE SPÉCIFIQUE AU PATIENT[2017/15]
Entry into regional phase03.01.2017National basic fee paid 
03.01.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/15]
03.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]US2012130505  (LONG JACK F [US] ET AL) [A] 1,3,8,9,24,25,31-37 * paragraphs [0160] - [0170]; figures 26-33 *;
 [A]US2014066933  (EK STEVEN [US] ET AL) [A] 2,10,22,23,26-30 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 31] , [0035]; figure 3E *;
 [A]US2012259423  (CARR JONATHAN E [US] ET AL) [A] 1,6,7,13,14 * paragraphs [0133] , [0139] , [0140] , [0161] , [0162]; figures 24,25,30-32 *;
 [A]US2012226315  (ALTARAC MOTI [US] ET AL) [A] 1,8,22,30 * paragraphs [0115] - [0117] - [0193] , [0199]; figures 4,4B *;
 [A]US2006074434  (WENSTROM RICHARD F JR [US] ET AL) [A] 4,11,12 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023]; figure 1 *