Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3152564

EP3152564 - TERMINAL CRIMPING DEVICE WITH ULTRASONIC QUALITY CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.03.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.06.2019  [2019/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[2017/15]
Inventor(s)01 / MAALOUF, Khalil John
3620 Fox Hill Drive
Chambersburg, Pennsylvania 17202 / US
02 / CHARLTON, John Dunaway
100 Berwyn Drive
Harrisburg, Pennsylvania 17112 / US
03 / STULL, David Michael
185 Sugar Maple Drive
Etters, Pennsylvania 17319 / US
04 / FRY, Charles David
99 Barnett Woods Road
New Bloomfield, Pennsylvania 17068 / US
 [2017/15]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2017/15]
Application number, filing date15729685.602.06.2015
[2017/15]
WO2015US33725
Priority number, dateUS20141429632804.06.2014         Original published format: US201414296328
[2017/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015187656
Date:10.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3152564
Date:12.04.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2015
[2017/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01N29/11, G01N29/34, G01N29/44, H01R43/048
[2017/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/15]
TitleGerman:ENDSTÜCK-QUETSCHVERBINDUNGSGERÄT MIT ULTRASCHALLQUALITÄTSKONTROLLE[2018/35]
English:TERMINAL CRIMPING DEVICE WITH ULTRASONIC QUALITY CONTROL[2017/15]
French:APPAREIL DE SERTISSAGE D'UN CONNECTEUR TERMINAL AVEC CONTRÔLE DE QUALITÉ ULTRASONORE[2018/35]
Former [2017/15]CRIMPVORRICHTUNG FÜR ANSCHLUSSQUELLEN MIT ULTRASCHALLQUALITÄTSKONTROLLE
Former [2017/15]DISPOSITIF DE SERTISSAGE DE BORNE AVEC CONTRÔLE DE LA QUALITÉ PAR ULTRASONS
Entry into regional phase29.12.2016National basic fee paid 
29.12.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
29.12.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/15]
29.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/23]
28.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201804   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2013197823  (WILLIAMS KEITH [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] - [0038] * [I] 2,3,7-9;
 [XI]US2012192407  (YOST WILLIAM T [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] - [0044] * [I] 2,3,10
 [XI]  - K. E. CRAMER ET AL, "A Method for the Verification of Wire Crimp Compression Using Ultrasonic Inspection", RESEARCH IN NONDESTRUCTIVE EVALUATION, (20100129), vol. 21, no. 1, doi:10.1080/09349840903154805, ISSN 0934-9847, pages 18 - 29, XP055145964 [X] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 11 - page 10, line 16 * [I] 4-6

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/09349840903154805