Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3146705

EP3146705 - NOISE-SENSITIVE ALERT PRESENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.11.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  31.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
[2017/13]
Inventor(s)01 / WEINBERG, Shira
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / KASHTAN, Guy
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / SCHLESINGER, Benny
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
04 / AGUERA Y ARCAS, Blaise
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
05 / CHEN, Christina Summer
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2018/18]
Former [2017/13]01 / WEINBERG, Shira
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / KASHTAN, Guy
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / SCHLESINGER, Benny
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
04 / AGUERA Y ARCAS, Blaise
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
05 / CHEN, Christina Summer
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[2018/18]
Former [2017/13]Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date15730313.216.05.2015
[2017/13]
WO2015US31266
Priority number, dateUS20141428143719.05.2014         Original published format: US201414281437
[2017/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2015179252
Date:26.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3146705
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2015
[2017/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3146705
Date:02.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04M19/04
[2017/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:GERÄUSCHSENSITIVE ALARM PRÄSENTATION[2017/48]
English:NOISE-SENSITIVE ALERT PRESENTATION[2017/13]
French:PRESENTATION D'UNE ALARME SENSIBLE AU BRUIT[2017/13]
Former [2017/13]PRÄSENTATION VON LÄRMEMPFINDLICHEM ALARM
Entry into regional phase22.09.2016National basic fee paid 
22.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.03.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/13]
22.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2018Fee for grant paid
23.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)05.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL02.05.2018
AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
IE16.05.2018
LU16.05.2018
MT16.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/51]AL02.05.2018
AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
IE16.05.2018
LU16.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
IE16.05.2018
LU16.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/24]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
IE16.05.2018
LU16.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/19]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
IE16.05.2018
LU16.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/17]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
LU16.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2018/51]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/50]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/49]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
NO02.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO03007474  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0030] * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 3,4;
 [XYI]US2008132290  (SHARABI IFTACH [IL], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,12,13 * abstract * * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0022] * [Y] 5,6,14,15 [I] 4;
 [Y]US2011077033  (SHUAI JUN [CN]) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0026] *;
 [IA]US2014051404  (CHHAUNKER GAURAV [IN], et al) [I] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0033] * [A] 9-11;
 [Y]US2003008687  (NISHIMURA YASUNORI [JP]) [Y] 14 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0070] *;
 [XAY]US2004127198  (ROSKIND JAMES A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,12,13 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0058] * [A] 3,4 [Y] 15;
 [XA]US2002076033  (BAWEJA BELJEET SINGH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,12,13 * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020] * [A] 3,4;
 [XA]US2006016896  (GRUPP JOACHIM [CH]) [X] 1,2,7,8,12,13 * abstract * * figures 1,2,4,5a,5b * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0083] * [A] 3,4,9-11;
 [A]US2008070640  (SHIN HO YONG [KR]) [A] 1-4,7,8,12,13 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE10003963  (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]) [A] 1-4,7,8,12,13 * abstract * * page 2, line 7 - line 55 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2004082317  (GRAEFEN EDDY A [US]) [A] 1,5,6 * abstract * * figures 1,5-8 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0046] *;
 [A]US6185296  (SAITOH MASASHI [JP]) [A] 14 * the whole document *