Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3152127

EP3152127 - CHILD-PROOF PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.03.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.01.2018  [2018/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Glaxo Group Limited
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[2017/15]
Inventor(s)01 / MARKEN, Brendan
GlaxoSmithKline
980 Great West Road
Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
 [2017/15]
Representative(s)Povey, Alexander W.G.
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[2017/15]
Application number, filing date15730415.502.06.2015
[2017/15]
WO2015EP62193
Priority number, dateGB2014000993304.06.2014         Original published format: GB 201409933
[2017/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015185521
Date:10.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3152127
Date:12.04.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2015
[2017/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:B65D75/32
[2017/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/15]
TitleGerman:KINDERSICHERE VERPACKUNG[2017/15]
English:CHILD-PROOF PACKAGE[2017/15]
French:EMBALLAGE À L'ÉPREUVE DES ENFANTS[2017/15]
Entry into regional phase11.11.2016National basic fee paid 
11.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
11.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/15]
11.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/04]
05.09.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2018/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US5088603  (KIRKPATRICK JACK H [US]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6422391  (SWARTZ TODD C [US]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2004188312  (STEPOWANY BRIAN T [US]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6199698  (HETRICK HAYDEE [US], et al) [X] 1,13,14,19 * figure 1 *;
 [X]EP2105389  (MONOSOL RX LLC [US]) [X] 1,13,14,19 * figures 4,5 *;
 [X]DE2321641  (ALUMINIUM WALZWERKE SINGEN) [X] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [X]GB2406088  (REXAM MED PACKAGING LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5938032  (SVEC JAMES A [US], et al) [X] 15 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2006023643  (PERRIGO L CO [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4243144  (MARGULIES HERMAN) [X] 1 * the whole document *