Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3160300

EP3160300 - PULL-OUT GUIDE FOR FURNITURE PARTS THAT CAN BE MOVED IN RELATION TO EACH OTHER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.01.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.03.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Paul Hettich GmbH & Co. KG
Vahrenkampstraße 12-16
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[2017/18]
Inventor(s)01 / KÄTHLER, Andreas
Tännesberger Weg 9
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
02 / JAEKEL, Steffen
Alter Postweg 13
32120 Hiddenhausen / DE
03 / FRANKE, Thomas
Hermann-Rosenberg-Strasse 1
32257 Bünde / DE
04 / MERTENS, Janine
Stedefreunder Str. 318
32051 Herford / DE
05 / BÜSCHER, Reinhard
Gärtnerstrasse 19a
32257 Bünde / DE
 [2017/18]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/18]
Application number, filing date15731071.525.06.2015
[2017/18]
WO2015EP64336
Priority number, dateDE20141010885425.06.2014         Original published format: DE102014108854
[2017/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015197743
Date:30.12.2015
Language:DE
[2015/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3160300
Date:03.05.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2015
[2017/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3160300
Date:02.05.2018
Language:DE
[2018/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:A47B88/493
[2017/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUSZUGSFÜHRUNG FÜR RELATIV ZUEINANDER BEWEGBARE MÖBELTEILE[2017/18]
English:PULL-OUT GUIDE FOR FURNITURE PARTS THAT CAN BE MOVED IN RELATION TO EACH OTHER[2017/18]
French:GUIDAGE TÉLESCOPIQUE POUR PARTIES DE MEUBLES MOBILES LES UNES PAR RAPPORT AUX AUTRES[2017/18]
Entry into regional phase23.01.2017National basic fee paid 
23.01.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
23.01.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/18]
23.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2018Fee for grant paid
21.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)05.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
IE25.06.2018
LU25.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
FR02.07.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/23]CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
IE25.06.2018
LU25.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
FR02.07.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/21]CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
IE25.06.2018
LU25.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/19]CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
IE25.06.2018
LU25.06.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/17]CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
LU25.06.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/15]CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/11]CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/10]CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2018/52]FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2018/51]FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/50]FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/49]FI02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/47]FI02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
NO02.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[XI]US5417496  (HOBBS JAMES D [US]) [X] 1-4,6,9-11 * column 6, line 38 - column 8, line 59; figures 4-8 * [I] 5;
 [X]US2006091770  (RITTER THOMAS [AT], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0033]; figures 1-3,7a-7c *;
 [E]WO2015109345  (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [E] 1-11 * page 4, line 5 - line 8 * * page 5, line 21 - page 10, line 22; figures 1-7 *;
 [AD]EP1959794  (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantDE3536654
 EP1959794