Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2986307

EP2986307 - REMOVAL OF IMPURITIES FROM PROTEIN A ELUATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  29.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 01.05.2019  [2019/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bio-rad Laboratories, Inc.
1000 Alfred Nobel Drive
Hercules, CA 94547 / US
[2016/08]
Inventor(s)01 / SNYDER, Mark
701 Calmar Avenue
Oakland, California 94610 / US
 [2016/08]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/08]von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date15733153.905.01.2015
[2016/08]
WO2015US10172
Priority number, dateUS201461923380P03.01.2014         Original published format: US 201461923380 P
[2016/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015103545
Date:09.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2986307
Date:24.02.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2015
[2016/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.07.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/00, C07K1/00, C07K16/00, C07K14/31
[2017/15]
Former International [2016/08]A61K38/00, C07K1/00, C07K16/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/08]
TitleGerman:ENTFERNUNG VON VERUNREINIGUNGEN AUS PROTEIN-A-ELUATEN[2016/08]
English:REMOVAL OF IMPURITIES FROM PROTEIN A ELUATES[2016/08]
French:ÉLIMINATION DES IMPURETÉS DES ÉLUATS DE LA PROTÉINE A[2016/08]
Entry into regional phase17.11.2015National basic fee paid 
17.11.2015Search fee paid 
17.11.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.2015Examination requested  [2016/08]
05.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/18]
27.03.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.07.2019
10.07.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XD]EP2657254  (ASAHI KASEI MEDICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [XD] 5-7 * The whole document, in particular the examples. *;
 [X]US2010168395  (SATO SATOSHI [JP]) [X] 5-7 * The whole document, in particular, the examples and para.118 *;
 [YD]WO2012003474  (UNIV CHICAGO [US], et al) [YD] 5-9 * The whole document, in particular, paragraph 26 *;
 [Y]US2010305310  (SNYDER MARK A [US]) [Y] 5-9 * The whole document, in particular, the examples. *
 [Y]  - HUI F. LIU ET AL, "Recovery and purification process development for monoclonal antibody production", MABS, (20100901), vol. 2, no. 5, doi:10.4161/mabs.2.5.12645, ISSN 1942-0862, pages 480 - 499, XP055027612 [Y] 5-9 * The whole document, in particular, p.485, LHC, para.5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/mabs.2.5.12645
International search[X]WO9801560  (UNIV MANCHESTER [GB], et al);
 [Y]US2008113421  (SHAW BRYAN F [US], et al);
 [Y]US2013053548  (SHENOY BHAMI [US], et al);
 [Y]US5151504  (CROZE EDWARD M [US]);
 [Y]US2013096276  (YOSHIDA SHINICHI [JP], et al)