Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3161695

EP3161695 - SYSTEM FOR REMOTE MONITORING AND SUPERVISION OF DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.03.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.03.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 12.09.2018  [2018/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Promeditec S.r.l.
Via Flavia 23/1
34148 Trieste / IT
[2017/18]
Inventor(s)01 / EMILI, Luca
Via Amedeo Modigliani 4
20144 Milano / IT
 [2017/18]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2017/18]
Application number, filing date15733686.826.06.2015
[2017/18]
WO2015EP64528
Priority number, dateIT2014MI0116927.06.2014         Original published format: IT MI20141169
[2017/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015197819
Date:30.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3161695
Date:03.05.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2015
[2017/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00
[2017/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/18]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR FERNÜBERWACHUNG UND KONTROLLE VON DATEN[2017/18]
English:SYSTEM FOR REMOTE MONITORING AND SUPERVISION OF DATA[2017/18]
French:SYSTEME DE SURVEILLANCE ET DE SUPERVISION A DISTANCE DE DONNEES[2017/18]
Entry into regional phase26.01.2017National basic fee paid 
26.01.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/18]
26.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[I]US2012117611  (WOOKEY MICHAEL [AU]) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [I]WO2014062395  (CITRIX SYSTEMS INC [US]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0088] , [0 94] , [ 176] *;
 [I]EP1001330  (CSAFE LTD [IL] FINJAN SOFTWARE LTD [IL]) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [I]  - YANG YU, TZICKER CIUEH, "Display-Only File Server: A Solution against Information Theft Due to Insider Attack", ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 - NEW YORK USA, (20041025), XP040010989 [I] 1-10 * the whole document *