Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3164287

EP3164287 - ANTI-SIPHONING DEVICE, PARTICULARLY FOR PREVENTING THE EXTRACTION OF FUEL FROM TANKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.02.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.04.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lago Accessori S.r.l.
Via I Maggio 20
35014 Fontaniva (PD) / IT
[2017/19]
Inventor(s)01 / LAGO, Fabio
Via Sant'antonio 33
35013 Cittadella / IT
02 / LAGO, Giovanni
Via dei Bersaglieri 10
35014 Fontaniva / IT
 [2017/19]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2017/19]
Application number, filing date15733732.001.07.2015
[2017/19]
WO2015EP65039
Priority number, dateIT2014TV0009704.07.2014         Original published format: IT TV20140097
[2017/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016001330
Date:07.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3164287
Date:10.05.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2016
[2017/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3164287
Date:01.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:B60K15/04
[2017/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:ABSAUGSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE ZUR VERMEIDUNG DER EXTRAKTION VON KRAFTSTOFF AUS TANKS[2017/19]
English:ANTI-SIPHONING DEVICE, PARTICULARLY FOR PREVENTING THE EXTRACTION OF FUEL FROM TANKS[2017/19]
French:DISPOSITIF ANTI-SIPHONAGE, EN PARTICULIER POUR EMPÊCHER L'EXTRACTION DE CARBURANT À PARTIR DE RÉSERVOIRS[2017/19]
Entry into regional phase02.02.2017National basic fee paid 
02.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
02.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/19]
02.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2018Fee for grant paid
22.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)03.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
[2019/37]
Former [2019/26]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/24]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/11]AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/10]AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT01.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2014028500  (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [A] 1-9 * figures 3,4 *;
 [A]GB2476954  (TISS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-9 * figure - *;
 [A]EP2165873  (LAGO ACCESSORI S R L [IT]) [A] 1-9 * figure - *;
 [A]WO2007110640  (TISS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 7 * figure - *;
 [A]FR2877277  (FOURMENT THIERRY [FR]) [A] 4 * figure - *;
 [A]FR2852893  (CZURYLO MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *