Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3160439

EP3160439 - METHOD OF FRIZZ REDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2017/18]METHOD OF FRIZZ REDUCTION USING A COMPOSITION COMPRISING A CROSSLINKABLE SILICONE
[2018/09]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.05.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.03.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.03.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CZ
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2019/26]
Former [2017/18]For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SONG, Brian, Xiaoqing
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
02 / YANG, Tiffany, Tien-Yun
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
 [2017/18]
Representative(s)P&G Patent Germany
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Straße 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/26]Sauvaître, Thibault Bruno
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2017/18]Briatore, Andrea
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date15734034.026.06.2015
[2017/18]
WO2015US37944
Priority number, dateUS201462018161P27.06.2014         Original published format: US 201462018161 P
[2017/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015200778
Date:30.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3160439
Date:03.05.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2015
[2017/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3160439
Date:26.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/58, A61K8/04, A61Q5/12
[2017/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR MINDERUNG DER HAARKRÄUSELUNG[2018/09]
English:METHOD OF FRIZZ REDUCTION[2018/09]
French:MÉTHODE DE CONTRÔLE DE FRISETTE[2018/09]
Former [2017/18]VERFAHREN ZUR KRÄUSELUNGSREDUZIERUNG MITHILFE EINER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT VERNETZBAREN SILIKONEN
Former [2017/18]METHOD OF FRIZZ REDUCTION USING A COMPOSITION COMPRISING A CROSSLINKABLE SILICONE
Former [2017/18]PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DES FRISOTTIS À L'AIDE D'UNE COMPOSITION COMPRENANT UNE SILICONE RÉTICULABLE
Entry into regional phase09.11.2016National basic fee paid 
09.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/18]
09.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
27.06.2018Fee for grant paid
27.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
[2020/09]
Former [2020/07]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
NL26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2019/51]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2013014140  (WACKER CHEMIE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,11-13 * pages 37,45-46; examples 1-6 * [Y] 1-14;
 [Y]EP2724749  (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * page 24 - page 25; examples k7-k11 *;
 [Y]WO2007136708  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 3, lines 5-8 * * pages 4-8 * * page 22, lines 5-10 * * pages 23-25; examples 1-18 *
by applicantUS34584
 US5104646
 US5106609
 US2826551
 US3964500
 US4364837
 US6607717
 US6482969
 US5807956
 US5981681
 US6207782
 US7465439
 US2007286837
 US2005048549
 US7041767
 US7217777
 US200700
 US4275055
 US2010120871