Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3166778

EP3166778 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING PARTS OF WATERPROOF AND BREATHABLE SHOES, PARTS OF WATERPROOF AND BREATHABLE SHOES PROVIDED WITH THE METHOD, AND WATERPROOF AND BREATHABLE SOLES PROVIDED WITH THE SHOE PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.04.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Geox S.p.A.
Via Feltrina Centro, 16
31044 Montebelluna, Frazione Biadene / IT
[2017/20]
Inventor(s)01 / POLEGATO MORETTI, Mario
Via Fantin 96
I-31035 Crocetta del Montello / IT
 [2017/20]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2017/20]
Application number, filing date15734418.510.07.2015
[2017/20]
WO2015EP65876
Priority number, dateIT2014PD0018411.07.2014         Original published format: IT PD20140184
[2017/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016005582
Date:14.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3166778
Date:17.05.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2016
[2017/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:B29D35/14, A43B13/22, A43B23/02, A43B1/00
[2017/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/20]
Validation statesMA07.02.2017
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON TEILEN FÜR WASSERDICHTE UND ATMUNGSAKTIVE SCHUHE, MIT DEM VERFAHREN BEREITGESTELLTE TEILE FÜR WASSERDICHTE UND ATMUNGSAKTIVE SCHUHE SOWIE WASSERDICHTE UND ATMUNGSAKTIVE SOHLEN MIT DEN SCHUHTEILEN[2017/20]
English:METHOD FOR PROVIDING PARTS OF WATERPROOF AND BREATHABLE SHOES, PARTS OF WATERPROOF AND BREATHABLE SHOES PROVIDED WITH THE METHOD, AND WATERPROOF AND BREATHABLE SOLES PROVIDED WITH THE SHOE PARTS[2017/20]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PARTIES DE CHAUSSURES IMPER-RESPIRANTES, PARTIES DE CHAUSSURES IMPER-RESPIRANTES PRODUITES AU MOYEN DUDIT PROCÉDÉ ET SEMELLES IMPER-RESPIRANTES POURVUES DESDITES PARTIES DE CHAUSSURES[2017/20]
Entry into regional phase07.02.2017National basic fee paid 
07.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
07.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/20]
07.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]US2005016023  (BURRIS DAN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10,12-15,18,19,22-27,32-34 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0048] * * figures 3-10 *;
 [Y]US5853854  (NAKANISHI MOTOYASU [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3,4,12-29,32-34 * figures 11a-13b * * column 6, line 10 - line 58 * * column 14, line 27 - column 15, line 57 *;
 [XY]WO2007052024  (O'CONNOR MICHAEL JOHN [IE], et al) [X] 9-11 * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 2 * * page 9, line 5 - page 14, line 4 * * figures 1-7 * [Y] 1,3,4,12-29,32-34;
 [XI]US2009211119  (MORETTI MARIO POLEGATO [IT]) [X] 9-11,14,15,18,19,22-24,27-29 * the whole document * [I] 32-34