blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3166541


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
05.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
22.03.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
08.03.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
01.03.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  03.04.2019  [2019/14]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
14.12.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.01.2019  [2019/03]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
02.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
23.03.2018 (Expected) grant published on  25.04.2018  [2018/17]
23.03.2018 Change: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.03.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.03.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
23.03.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.11.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.10.2017 Change - German title published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
20.10.2017 Change - English title published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
20.10.2017 Change - French title published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
15.09.2017 Change: Validation states published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
15.09.2017 Change - extension states published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
04.09.2017 Amendment by applicant
22.06.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.04.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.05.2017  [2017/20]
18.04.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
18.04.2017 Request for examination filed published on  17.05.2017  [2017/20]
21.03.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
28.02.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
11.02.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
07.02.2017 Change - representative
07.02.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
23.01.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
15.01.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
20.07.2015 PCT data prior to European publication