blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3166541
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9757243Global Dossier 12.09.2017B2
US2016008136 14.01.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201462063497 14.10.2014
US201462021976 08.07.2014
US201514749908 25.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3166541Global Dossier 25.04.2018B1
EP3166541 17.05.2017A1
Priority number Date
WO2015US37608 25.06.2015
US201462063497 14.10.2014
US201462021976 08.07.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2016007304Global Dossier 14.01.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201462063497 14.10.2014
US201462021976 08.07.2014