Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3166541

EP3166541 - INTERCONDYLAR COMPONENT FOR USE IN KNEE ARTHROPLASTY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2017/20]INTERCONDYLAR COMPONENT AND FIN ATTACHMENT FEATURES FOR USE IN KNEE ARTHROPLASTY
[2017/47]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.11.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.04.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer, Inc.
1800 W. Center Street
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
[2017/20]
Inventor(s)01 / JONES, Nolan C.
165 E Deerwood Ct.
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
02 / ROBERTS, Shanon N.
2937 S 300W
Columbia City, Indiana 46725 / US
 [2017/20]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2017/20]
Application number, filing date15736126.225.06.2015
[2017/20]
WO2015US37608
Priority number, dateUS201462021976P08.07.2014         Original published format: US 201462021976 P
US201462063497P14.10.2014         Original published format: US 201462063497 P
[2017/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016007304
Date:14.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3166541
Date:17.05.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2016
[2017/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3166541
Date:25.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/38
[2017/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:INTERKONDYLÄRE KOMPONENTE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER KNIEATHROPLASTIE[2017/47]
English:INTERCONDYLAR COMPONENT FOR USE IN KNEE ARTHROPLASTY[2017/47]
French:COMPOSANT INTERCONDYLIEN UTILISABLE DANS UNE ARTHROPLASTIE DU GENOU[2017/47]
Former [2017/20]BEFESTIGUNGSMITTEL FÜR INTERKONDYLÄRE KOMPONENTE UND LAMELLE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER KNIEATHROPLASTIE
Former [2017/20]INTERCONDYLAR COMPONENT AND FIN ATTACHMENT FEATURES FOR USE IN KNEE ARTHROPLASTY
Former [2017/20]COMPOSANT INTERCONDYLIEN ET ÉLÉMENTS DE FIXATION EN FORME D'AILETTE UTILISABLES DANS UNE ARTHROPLASTIE DU GENOU
Entry into regional phase07.02.2017National basic fee paid 
07.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
07.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/20]
07.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.2018Fee for grant paid
19.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)28.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
MC25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SI25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
IE25.06.2018
LU25.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/24]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
MC25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
IE25.06.2018
LU25.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/19]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
MC25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
IE25.06.2018
LU25.06.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/17]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
MC25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
LU25.06.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
MC25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/03]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
Former [2018/51]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/50]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/49]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/47]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL25.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]US2011264097  (HODOREK ROBERT A [US] ET AL) [X] 1-8,10-15,21-23 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0061] * * figures 4-6,9,10 *;
 [X]US2006224244  (THOMAS BRIAN H [US] ET AL) [X] 1-8,10-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0027] * * figures 1,3 *;
 [X]US2006235517  (HODOREK ROBERT A [US]) [X] 21-23 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2012310361  (ZUBOK RAY [US] ET AL) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0109] * * figures 1A-1H *
by applicantUS5282861
 US7846376
 US7918382
 US8608049
 US2012125896
    - LEVINE, B.R. ET AL., "Experimental and Clinical Performance of Porous Tantalum in Orthopedic Surgery", BIOMATERIALS, (2006), vol. 27, pages 4671 - 4681