Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3169346

EP3169346 - ANTI-INFLAMMATORY PROPERTIES OF A SURFACE PROTEIN OF PROPIONIBACTERIUM FREUDENREICHII [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 14.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.12.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.04.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 14.08.2019 [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut National de la Recherche Agronomique (INRA)
147, rue de l'Université
75338 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
For all designated states
Institut Pasteur de Lille (IPL)
1, rue du Professeur Calmette
59800 Lille / FR
[2018/47]
Former [2017/21]For all designated states
Institut National de la Recherche Agronomique (INRA)
147, rue de l'Université
75338 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
For all designated states
INSTITUT PASTEUR DE LILLE
1, rue du Professeur Calmette
59800 Lille / FR
Inventor(s)01 / JAN, Gwenael
22, allée Ferdinand
F-35000 Rennes / FR
02 / FOLIGNE, Benoit
53 Rue de Trévise
F-59000 Lille / FR
03 / FALENTIN, Hélène
8, allée du Ruisseau
F-35310 Mordelles / FR
04 / DEUTSCH, Stéphanie-Marie
14, Rue de la Borderie
F-35740 Pacé / FR
 [2019/12]
Former [2017/21]01 / JAN, Gwenael
22 Allée Ferdinand
F-35000 Rennes / FR
02 / FOLIGNE, Benoit
53 Rue de Trévise
F-59000 Lille / FR
03 / FALENTIN, Hélène
8 Allée du Ruisseau
F-35310 Mordelles / FR
04 / DEUTSCH, Stéphanie-Marie
14 Rue de la Borderie
F-35740 Pacé / FR
Representative(s)Barbot, Willy
Simodoro-ip
82, rue Sylvabelle
13006 Marseille / FR
[2019/12]
Former [2017/21]Barbot, Willy
SIMODORO-ip
1 place des Prêcheurs
13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR
Application number, filing date15736194.007.07.2015
[2017/21]
WO2015EP01379
Priority number, dateEP2014000242915.07.2014         Original published format: EP 14002429
[2017/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016008571
Date:21.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3169346
Date:24.05.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016
[2017/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3169346
Date:20.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/16, A61P29/00
[2017/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/21]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:ENTZÜNDUNGSHEMMENDE EIGENSCHAFTEN EINES OBERFLÄCHENPROTEINS AUS PROPIONIBAKTERIUM FREUDENREICHII[2017/21]
English:ANTI-INFLAMMATORY PROPERTIES OF A SURFACE PROTEIN OF PROPIONIBACTERIUM FREUDENREICHII[2017/21]
French:PROPRIÉTÉS ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRES D'UNE PROTÉINE DE SURFACE DE PROPIONIBACTERIUM FREUDENREICHII[2017/21]
Entry into regional phase15.02.2017National basic fee paid 
15.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
15.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/21]
05.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
05.02.2019Fee for grant paid
05.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
NO20.06.2019
[2019/33]
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1738761  (MEIJI DAIRIES CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ANNE THIERRY ET AL, "New insights into physiology and metabolism of Propionibacterium freudenreichii", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF FOOD MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 149, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.IJFOODMICRO.2011.04.026, ISSN 0168-1605, (20110508), pages 19 - 27, (20110508), XP028249371 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijfoodmicro.2011.04.026
 [A]  - HÉLÈNE FALENTIN ET AL, "The Complete Genome of Propionibacterium freudenreichii CIRM-BIA1T, a Hardy Actinobacterium with Food and Probiotic Applications", PLOS ONE, (20100101), vol. 5, no. 7, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0011748, ISSN 1932-6203, page e11748, XP055013560 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0011748