Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3169346 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3169346



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 443
01.04.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.02.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
30.01.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
30.01.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
30.01.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
28.01.2019 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
28.01.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.01.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
28.01.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
28.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.10.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
26.10.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
26.10.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
26.10.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 58
26.10.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 58
26.10.2018 Text intended for grant (sequence listing) Search / examination 4
20.08.2018 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
14.08.2018 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
03.04.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
03.04.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
03.04.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
03.04.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
27.03.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
27.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.03.2018 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
27.03.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.12.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
20.12.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.12.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
05.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.09.2017 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 1
26.04.2017 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.03.2017 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
22.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.02.2017 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 3
07.02.2017 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 5
07.02.2017 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.02.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
31.01.2017 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
31.01.2017 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
31.01.2017 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
31.01.2017 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
31.01.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
30.01.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
25.11.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.02.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 45
21.01.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
21.01.2016 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 59
21.01.2016 Sequence listing Search / examination 4
06.10.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
06.10.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
06.10.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
16.07.2015 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
16.07.2015 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
16.07.2015 Description PCT receiving Office 45
16.07.2015 Drawings PCT receiving Office 11
16.07.2015 Sequence listing PCT receiving Office 4
07.07.2015 Payment of fees and costs PCT receiving Office 1
07.07.2015 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 44