Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3178093

EP3178093 - CABLE COMPRISING A CROSSLINKED LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nexans
4, Allée de l'Arche
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[2017/30]
Former [2017/24]For all designated states
Nexans
8, rue du Général Foy
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / KEROMNES, Laurent
45 Avenue de Verdun
F-69630 Chaponost / FR
02 / ABEGUILE, Mikael
284 Boulevard Gambetta
F-69400 Villefranche-sur-Saône / FR
03 / PETITET, Laurent
Chemin de la Croix de Margarat
F-42330 Saint Galmier / FR
 [2017/24]
Representative(s)Peguet, Wilfried
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63 avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/24]Peguet, Wilfried
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
Application number, filing date15736562.822.06.2015
[2017/24]
WO2015FR51655
Priority number, dateFR2014005768007.08.2014         Original published format: FR 1457680
[2017/24]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016020583
Date:11.02.2016
Language:FR
[2016/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3178093
Date:14.06.2017
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2016
[2017/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01B3/44, C08K5/16
[2017/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/24]
TitleGerman:KABEL MIT VERNETZTER SCHICHT[2017/24]
English:CABLE COMPRISING A CROSSLINKED LAYER[2017/24]
French:CÂBLE COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE RÉTICULÉE[2017/24]
Entry into regional phase07.03.2017National basic fee paid 
07.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/24]
08.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2007107667  (NEXANS [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-22; tables 1-3 *;
 [A]EP1340788  (NEXANS [FR]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0019]; claims 1-10 *;
 [A]WO2012052077  (BOREALIS AG [AT], et al) [A] 1-13 * tables 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0490854  (INST POLYMERUTVECKLING AB [SE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
by applicantEP2001912