Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3178093


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.06.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.06.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.10.2017 Change: Validation states published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
13.10.2017 Change - extension states published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
08.09.2017 Amendment by applicant
30.06.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.06.2017 Change - applicant published on  26.07.2017  [2017/30]
12.05.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.06.2017  [2017/24]
12.05.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
12.05.2017 Request for examination filed published on  14.06.2017  [2017/24]
18.04.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
10.03.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
24.02.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
27.01.2017 Change - representative
27.01.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
16.02.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
12.02.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
22.07.2015 PCT data prior to European publication