Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3146749

EP3146749 - DEVICE QUARANTINE IN A WIRELESS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.11.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  21.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
[2017/13]
Inventor(s)01 / HAUGEN, Todd
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / HASSAN, Amer A.
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / MENEZES, Pascal F.
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2017/13]
Representative(s)Townsend, Martyn
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2017/13]
Application number, filing date15736873.919.06.2015
[2017/13]
WO2015US36587
Priority number, dateUS20141431250123.06.2014         Original published format: US201414312501
[2017/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015200106
Date:30.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3146749
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2015
[2017/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W12/12, H04W48/02, H04W12/08, H04L12/24, H04L29/06
[2019/47]
Former International [2017/13]H04W12/08, H04L29/08, H04W48/00, H04L12/24, H04L29/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/13]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGSQUARANTÄNE IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERK[2017/13]
English:DEVICE QUARANTINE IN A WIRELESS NETWORK[2017/13]
French:QUARANTAINE DE DISPOSITIF DANS UN RÉSEAU SANS FIL[2017/13]
Entry into regional phase21.12.2016National basic fee paid 
21.12.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/13]
21.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2007147318  (ROSS ALAN D [US], et al) [X] 1,5,8,9,12-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0003] , [ 0014] , [ 0016] , [ 0018] , [ 0019] , [ 0021] , [ 0023] * * paragraphs [0025] , [ 0027] , [ 0030] , [ 0032] - [0035] - [ 0037] , [ 0038] , [ 0040] * * paragraphs [0041] , [ 0044] , [ 0047] , [ 0048] , [ 0051] - [0053] * [I] 2-4,6,7,10,11,15;
 [I]US2007055752  (WIEGAND JIM [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0007] - [ 0021] - [0026] - [ 0028] , [ 0029] , [ 0031] - [0036] - [ 0039] * * paragraphs [0041] , [ 0042] , [ 0043] , [ 0046] - [0056] - [ 0066] , [ 0067] , [ 0072] * * paragraphs [0073] , [ 0082] , [ 0083] , [ 0085] , [ 0086] , [ 0088] , [ 0096] *;
 [A]US2007157313  (DENTON GUY S [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [ 0005] , [ 0006] , [ 0009] - [0011] - [ 0016] - [0018] - [ 0023] - [0047] * * paragraphs [0049] , [ 0061] , [ 0063] *