Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3094575

EP3094575 - UNDERWATER ENERGY STORAGE USING COMPRESSED FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.12.2018  [2018/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bright Energy Storage Technologies, LLP
8035 East 40th Avenue
Denver, CO 80207 / US
[2016/47]
Inventor(s)01 / FRAZIER, Scott Raymond
8837 S. Fairall Road
Morrison, CO 80465 / US
02 / VON HERZEN, Brian
1353 Santa Cruz Drive
Minden, NV 89423 / US
03 / LAU, Alex
5525 W. 56th Avenue
Arvada, CO 80002 / US
 [2016/47]
Representative(s)Lloyd, Robin , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/47]Lloyd, Robin , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date15737482.814.01.2015
[2016/47]
WO2015US11314
Priority number, dateUS201461927634P15.01.2014         Original published format: US 201461927634 P
[2016/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015108915
Date:23.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3094575
Date:23.11.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2015
[2016/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR23.07.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:B65D88/78, F17C1/00, F17C13/00
[2017/48]
Former International [2016/47]B65D88/78
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/47]
TitleGerman:UNTERWASSERENERGIESPEICHER MITHILFE VON KOMPRIMIERTER FLÜSSIGKEIT[2016/47]
English:UNDERWATER ENERGY STORAGE USING COMPRESSED FLUID[2016/47]
French:SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE SUBMERGÉ UTILISANT UN FLUIDE COMPRIMÉ[2016/47]
Entry into regional phase10.08.2016National basic fee paid 
10.08.2016Search fee paid 
10.08.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
10.08.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.2016Examination requested  [2016/47]
13.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/49]
04.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2011070031  (FRAZIER SCOTT RAYMOND [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,10-12,14,15,17,19 * fig.1-3, (112), (104), (120), (118), (108), (116), figs.15-18; [0050], [0054], [0055], [0074]-[0076]; * [I] 7,9,13,16,18;
 [A]US2012012276  (VON HERZEN BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * fig.4, (48), (58), (70); fig.2, 3; fig.7, (100) *;
 [A]EP0308562  (SHIMIZU CONSTRUCTION CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-19 * fig.3-5; fig.11 (a)-(d); fig.12, 14; abstract *;
 [A]WO2011084164  (HORTON WISON DEEPWATER INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * fig.1, (10); fig.8, (81), (82); abstract *
International search[X]US2011070031  (FRAZIER SCOTT RAYMOND [US], et al);
 [Y]US2012012276  (VON HERZEN BRIAN [US], et al);
 [A]US4958956  (TANAKA MASAHIRO [JP], et al);
 [A]US2004191000  (WEBSTER BRIAN Y [US], et al);
 [A]JPH1061599  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD)