Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3191410

EP3191410 - HIGH-DENSITY PRECURSOR FOR MANUFACTURE OF COMPOSITE METAL OXIDE CATHODES FOR LI-ION BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino CA 95014 / US
[2018/31]
Former [2017/29]For all designated states
Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DAI, Hongli
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, California 95014 / US
02 / JOHNSON, Christopher S.
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, California 95014 / US
03 / WU, Huiming
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, California 95014 / US
04 / CARTER, John David
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, California 95014 / US
 [2017/29]
Representative(s)Simmons & Simmons
City Point
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/29]Cordina, Kevin John
CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro
Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
Application number, filing date15738227.601.07.2015
[2017/29]
WO2015US38890
Priority number, dateUS20141444998701.08.2014         Original published format: US201414449987
[2017/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016018561
Date:04.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3191410
Date:19.07.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2016
[2017/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:C01G51/00, C01G53/00, C01G51/04, H01M4/505, H01M4/525
[2017/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/29]
TitleGerman:HOCHDICHTE VORLÄUFER ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERBUNDMETALLOXIDKATHODEN FÜR LI-IONEN-BATTERIEN[2017/29]
English:HIGH-DENSITY PRECURSOR FOR MANUFACTURE OF COMPOSITE METAL OXIDE CATHODES FOR LI-ION BATTERIES[2017/29]
French:PRÉCURSEUR À HAUTE DENSITÉ POUR LA FABRICATION DE CATHODES D'OXYDE MÉTALLIQUE COMPOSITE POUR BATTERIES LITHIUM-ION[2017/29]
Entry into regional phase28.02.2017National basic fee paid 
28.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/29]
28.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.04.2018Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
08.06.2018Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
15.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO2014119165  (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO [JP]) [XP] 1-27 * the whole document *;
 [XDP]US2014272563  (DAI HONGLI [US], et al) [XDP] 12-17,25-27 * paragraph [0007]; example 1; claim - *;
 [XI]US2014158932  (SUN YANG-KOOK [KR], et al) [X] 1-15,17-26 * paragraph [0020]; example 1; claim - * [I] 16,27;
 [X]US2006081818  (ITO HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 12,17-26 * paragraphs [0010] - [0013]; example 1; claim - *;
 [X]CN102110808  (HENAN KELONG GROUP CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5-15,17,25,26 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2008069351  (SK ENERGY CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 18-24 * page 10, line 24 - page 11, line 11; example 1 *