Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3162123

EP3162123 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LIGHTWEIGHT MESSAGING DURING INITIAL SYNCHRONIZATION, DISCOVERY, AND ASSOCIATION IN DIRECTIONAL WIRELESS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.11.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.03.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Change - divisional application(s)published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2017/18]
Inventor(s)01 / EL AYACH, Omar
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / SUBRAMANIAN, Sundar
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / SMEE, John Edward
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / SAMPATH, Ashwin
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
05 / LI, Junyi
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/18]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/18]
Application number, filing date15738504.812.06.2015
[2017/18]
WO2015US35548
Priority number, dateUS20141431854227.06.2014         Original published format: US201414318542
[2017/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015200009
Date:30.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3162123
Date:03.05.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2015
[2017/18]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3162123
Date:11.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W48/12
[2017/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR GEMÄSSIGTEN NACHRICHTENÜBERMITTLUNG WÄHREND DER ANFANGSSYNCHRONISATION, ENTDECKUNG UND ASSOZIATION IN DIREKTIONALEN DRAHTLOSEN SYSTEMEN[2017/18]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LIGHTWEIGHT MESSAGING DURING INITIAL SYNCHRONIZATION, DISCOVERY, AND ASSOCIATION IN DIRECTIONAL WIRELESS SYSTEMS[2017/18]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE MESSAGERIE LÉGÈRE PENDANT LA SYNCHRONISATION, LA DÉCOUVERTE ET L'ASSOCIATION INITIALES DANS DES SYSTÈMES SANS FIL DIRECTIONNELS[2017/18]
Entry into regional phase15.11.2016National basic fee paid 
15.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
15.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/18]
15.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.11.2019Fee for grant paid
01.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19207990.3
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
08.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2014009250  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI]) [X] 1-5,7-12,14-19,21-26,28 * page 17, line 28 - page 18, line 24; figure 6 * * page 22, line 17 - page 25, line 11; figures 4,5A * * page 28, line 18 - page 29, line 23 * [I] 6,13,20,27;
 [X]US2007287384  (SADRI ALI S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9,15,16,22,23 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0048]; figure 4 *;
 [I]  - HYUNHEE PARK ET AL, "Cooperative neighbor disco very for consumer devices in mmWave ad-hoc Networks", CONSUMER ELECTRONICS (ICCE), 2012 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120113), doi:10.1109/ICCE.2012.6161759, ISBN 978-1-4577-0230-3, pages 100 - 101, XP032124786 [I] 1,8,15,22 * II. Cooperative Neighbor Discovery (CoopND) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCE.2012.6161759
 [A]  - FUMIHIDE KOJIMA ET AL, "Necessary Modifications on Conventional IEEE802.15.3b MAC to Achieve IEEE802.15.3c Millimeter Wave WPAN", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS. PIMRC, IEEE; PI, XX, (20070901), ISBN 978-1-4244-1143-6, pages 1 - 5, XP031168693 [A] 1-28 * III. Automatic Device Discovery (ADD) *
 [T]  - PENG HAILAN ET AL, "Extended user/control plane architectures for tightly coupled LTE/WiGig interworking in millimeter-wave heterogeneous networks", 2015 IEEE WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE (WCNC), IEEE, (20150309), doi:10.1109/WCNC.2015.7127698, pages 1548 - 1553, XP032786567 [T] 1-28 * IV. PROPOSED TIGHTLY COUPLED LTE/WIGIG RADIO INTERWORKING SOLUTION *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WCNC.2015.7127698
 [T]  - DESAI VIP ET AL, "Initial beamforming for mmWave communications", 2014 48TH ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS, IEEE, (20141102), doi:10.1109/ACSSC.2014.7094805, pages 1926 - 1930, XP032769050 [T] 1-28 * II. Problem Description * * III. Implementing Precoding * * IV. Procedure *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.2014.7094805