Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3172909

EP3172909 - SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR AUTO CONFIGURATION OF MULTI-SIM BASED DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.11.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.04.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  12.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2017/22]
Inventor(s)01 / LALWANEY, Poornima Assudo
c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/22]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/22]
Application number, filing date15739060.019.06.2015
[2017/22]
WO2015US36684
Priority number, dateUS20141434038224.07.2014         Original published format: US201414340382
[2017/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016014184
Date:28.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3172909
Date:31.05.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2016
[2017/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3172909
Date:09.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W8/20
[2017/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND PROZESS ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN KONFIGURATION VON MULTI-SIM BASIERTEN GERÄTEN[2017/49]
English:SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR AUTO CONFIGURATION OF MULTI-SIM BASED DEVICES[2017/22]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA CONFIGURATION AUTOMATISÉE D'APPAREILS À SIM MULTIPLES[2017/49]
Former [2017/22]SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SELBSTKONFIGURATION VON MULTI-SIM-BASIERTEN VORRICHTUNGEN
Former [2017/22]SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'AUTO-CONFIGURATION DE DISPOSITIFS À PLUSIEURS CARTES SIM
Entry into regional phase12.12.2016National basic fee paid 
12.12.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.05.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/22]
12.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2018Fee for grant paid
29.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)12.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
IT09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
MC09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SI09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
IE19.06.2018
LU19.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/24]AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
IT09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
MC09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
IE19.06.2018
LU19.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/21]AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
IT09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
MC09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
IE19.06.2018
LU19.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/19]AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
IT09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
MC09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
IE19.06.2018
LU19.06.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/17]AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
IT09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
MC09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
LU19.06.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
IT09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
MC09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
IT09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT09.05.2018
CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2018/51]ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
Former [2018/50]ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
Former [2018/49]ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
NO09.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2013189193  (TCL MOBILE COMM CO LTD HUIZHOU [CN]) [I] 1-30 * abstract * * S101 - S103 Figure 1, English Translation of the Abstract;; figure 1 *;
 CN102724657  [ ] (HUIZHOU TCL MOBILE COMM CO LTD) [ ] * page 1, line 1 - page 6, line 26 *;
 [I]CN101267631B  (ZTE CORP [CN]) [I] 1-30 * SUMMARY OF THE INVENTION * * EMBODIMENT *;
 [A]WO2014092385  (KT CORP [KR]) [A] 1-30 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2013039900  (ALCATEL LUCENT USA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * Background * * Summary *;
 [A]EP2056630  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0031] *;
 [A]US2005164737  (BROWN JASON [US]) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0024] *