Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3161603

EP3161603 - MANIPULATION OF CALENDAR APPLICATION IN DEVICE WITH TOUCH SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.09.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.09.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.02.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.03.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino CA 95014 / US
[2018/31]
Former [2017/18]For all designated states
Apple Inc.
One Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHAUDHRI, Imran
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / LEMAY, Stephen, O.
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
03 / DYE, Alan, C.
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
04 / FOSS, Christopher, Patrick
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
05 / WILSON, Christopher
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
06 / WILSON, Eric, Lance
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
07 / YANG, Lawrence, Y.
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
08 / IVE, Jonathan, P.
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
09 / NELSON, Britt, K.
1970 Sutter Street Apt. 209
San Francisco, CA 94115 / US
10 / PARK, Dennis S.
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 94115 / US
 [2017/18]
Representative(s)Simmons & Simmons
City Point
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[2019/42]
Former [2017/18]Cordina, Kevin John
Olswang LLP
90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
Application number, filing date15739110.326.06.2015
[2017/18]
WO2015US38174
Priority number, dateUS201462018529P27.06.2014         Original published format: US 201462018529 P
US201462047611P08.09.2014         Original published format: US 201462047611 P
US201562129848P08.03.2015         Original published format: US 201562129848 P
[2017/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2015200890
Date:30.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/52]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3161603
Date:03.05.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2015
[2017/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3161603
Date:16.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0487, G06F3/0488, G06F3/0482, G06Q10/10, H04M1/725, G06F1/16, G06F3/0362, G06F3/041
[2017/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEDIENUNG EINER KALENDARANWENDUNG IN EINEM GERÄT MIT BERÜHRUNGSEMPFINDLICHEM BILDSCHIRM[2019/13]
English:MANIPULATION OF CALENDAR APPLICATION IN DEVICE WITH TOUCH SCREEN[2017/18]
French:MANIPULATION D'UNE APPLICATION DE CALENDRIER DANS UN APPAREIL AVEC ÉCRAN TACTILE[2017/18]
Former [2017/18]MANIPULATION EINER KALENDERANWENDUNG IN EINER VORRICHTUNG MIT BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRM
Entry into regional phase22.09.2016National basic fee paid 
22.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/18]
22.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.03.2019
07.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
04.07.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
04.07.2019Fee for grant paid
04.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.09.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
11.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16190252.3  / EP3147747
EP19185318.3
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2006069604  (LEUKART RICHARD H [US], et al) [Y] 1-12,41-50,54,55,59,60,64-76,105-113 * abstract * * figures 1, 6 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] *;
 [Y]US2006197753  (HOTELLING STEVEN P [US]) [Y] 1-12,41-50,54,55,59,60,64-76,105-113 * abstract * * figures 25, 26 * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0097] * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0150] *;
 [A]EP2547117  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 5,9,12,69,73,76 * abstract * * figures 1, 4, 7-9 * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0092] *;
 [I]EP1679879  (APPLE COMPUTER [US]) [I] 13-31,51,52,56,57,61,62,77-95 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0055] *;
 [A]US2007030256  (AKAIKE KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 14,16-19,78,80-83 * abstract * * figures 1, 4 * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0076] *;
 [I]EP2693382  (SAP AG [DE]) [I] 32-40,53,58,63,96-104 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0048] *
 [Y]  - "Tablet Talk App: Frequently Asked Questions - Tablet Talk", (20140625), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20140625102903/http://www.tablettalkapp.com/faq/, (20160107), XP055239162 [Y] 5,9,12,69,73,76 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - Ellis Benus, "Put a Phone Number in Google Calender Where Line to Click to Call", (20121031), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20121031054804/http://ellisbenus.com/ellis-benus/use-a-phone-number-in-the-google-calender-where-line-for-one-click-calling/, (20160107), XP055239362 [Y] 6,10,70,74 * the whole document *
by applicantUS7657849
 US6323846
 US6570557
 US6677932
 US2002015024
 US2005190059
 US2006017692