Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3161731

EP3161731 - FEATURE PROCESSING TRADEOFF MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.03.2019
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.03.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amazon Technologies, Inc.
P.O. Box 81226
Seattle, WA 98108-1226 / US
[2017/18]
Inventor(s)01 / DIRAC, Leo Parker
410 Terry Avenue North
Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US
02 / CORREA, Nicolle M.
410 Terry Avenue North
Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US
03 / DANNAKER, Charles Eric
410 Terry Avenue North
Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US
04 / INGERMAN, Aleksandr Mikhaylovich
410 Terry Avenue North
Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US
05 / KRISHNAN, Sriram
410 Terry Avenue North
Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US
06 / LI, Jin
410 Terry Avenue North
Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US
07 / PUVVADI, Sudhakar Rao
410 Terry Avenue North
Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US
08 / ZARANDIOON, Saman
410 Terry Avenue North
Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US
09 / RAMAKRISHNAN, Rakesh
410 Terry Avenue North
Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US
10 / ZHENG, Tianming
410 Terry Avenue North
Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US
11 / ZHUO, Donghui
410 Terry Avenue North
Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US
12 / AGARWAL, Tarun
410 Terry Avenue North
Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US
13 / STEELE, Robert Matthias
410 Terry Avenue North
Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US
14 / QIAN, Jun
410 Terry Avenue North
Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US
15 / BRUECKNER, Michael
410 Terry Avenue North
Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US
16 / HERBRICH, Ralf
410 Terry Avenue North
Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US
17 / BLICK, Daniel
410 Terry Avenue North
Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US
18 / LEE, Polly Po Yee
410 Terry Avenue North
Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US
 [2017/18]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2017/18]
Application number, filing date15739124.430.06.2015
[2017/18]
WO2015US38589
Priority number, dateUS20141431988030.06.2014         Original published format: US201414319880
US20141431990230.06.2014         Original published format: US201414319902
US20141446031414.08.2014         Original published format: US201414460314
US20141446031214.08.2014         Original published format: US201414460312
US20141446343419.08.2014         Original published format: US201414463434
US20141448420111.09.2014         Original published format: US201414484201
US20141448944917.09.2014         Original published format: US201414489449
US20141448944817.09.2014         Original published format: US201414489448
US20141453872311.11.2014         Original published format: US201414538723
US20141456945812.12.2014         Original published format: US201414569458
[2017/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016004062
Date:07.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3161731
Date:03.05.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2016
[2017/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06N99/00
[2017/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/18]
TitleGerman:MERKMALSVERARBEITUNGSAUSGLEICHSVERWALTUNG[2017/18]
English:FEATURE PROCESSING TRADEOFF MANAGEMENT[2017/18]
French:GESTION DE COMPROMIS POUR UN TRAITEMENT DE CARACTÉRISTIQUES[2017/18]
Entry into regional phase30.01.2017National basic fee paid 
30.01.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
30.01.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/18]
03.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2012151198  (GOOGLE INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0 33] * * paragraphs [0046] - [0054] * * paragraphs [0060] - [0070] *;
 [I]US2011313953  (LANE NICHOLAS D [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0031] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US8370280  (LIN WEI-HAO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 1 - column 9, line 13 * * figure 5 * * claim 1 *