Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3148402

EP3148402 - DEVICE FOR VIEWING THE INSIDE OF THE MOUTH OF A PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.03.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.2020New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Duret, François
Château de Tarailhan
11560 Fleury d'Aude / FR
For all designated states
Querbes, Olivier
13 rue Guiraut Riquier
31750 Esqualquens / FR
For all designated states
Querbes-Duret, Véronique
13 rue Guiraut Riquier
31750 Esqualquens / FR
For all designated states
Condor SAS
Châteaux de Tarailhan
11560 Fleury d'Aude / FR
[2017/19]
Former [2017/14]For all designated states
Duret, François
Château de Tarailhan
11560 Fleury d'Aude / FR
For all designated states
Querbes, Olivier
13 rue Guiraut Riquier
31750 Esqualquens / FR
For all designated states
Querbes-Duret, Véronique
13 rue Guiraut Riquier
31750 Esqualquens / FR
Inventor(s)01 / DURET, François
Château de Tarailhan
11560 Fleury D'aude / FR
02 / QUERBES, Olivier
13 Rue Guiraut Riquier
31750 Esqualquens / FR
03 / QUERBES-DURET, Véronique
13 Rue Guiraut Riquier
31750 Esqualquens / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/14]01 / DURET, François
Château de Tarailhan
11560 Fleury D'aude / FR
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet BREV&SUD
55 Avenue Clément Ader
34170 Castelnau le Lez / FR
[2017/14]
Application number, filing date15739308.327.05.2015
[2017/14]
WO2015FR00104
Priority number, dateFR2014005477427.05.2014         Original published format: FR 1454774
FR2014006153927.05.2014         Original published format: FR 1461539
[2017/14]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015181454
Date:03.12.2015
Language:FR
[2015/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3148402
Date:05.04.2017
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2015
[2017/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B1/24, A61B1/00, G06T19/00, A61B1/247, G02B27/01
[2017/14]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/14]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR BETRACHTUNG DER INNENSEITE DES MUNDES EINES PATIENTEN[2017/14]
English:DEVICE FOR VIEWING THE INSIDE OF THE MOUTH OF A PATIENT[2017/14]
French:DISPOSITIF DE VISUALISATION DE L'INTERIEUR D'UNE BOUCHE D'UN PATIENT[2017/14]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2016National basic fee paid 
30.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/14]
30.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.09.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
23.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.01.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
Request for further processing for:23.11.2017Request for further processing filed
23.11.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.12.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
24.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
17.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2012056993  (LUQMAN SALMAN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-11,13,14 * the whole document * [Y] 5,7,12;
 [Y]WO2004100067  (D3D L P [US], et al) [Y] 5,7,12 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2012289777  (CHOPRA PRASHANT [US], et al) [Y] 5,7,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2008149172  (PAVLOPOULOS PANAGIOTIS [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * claims 1-31 *;
 [A]WO2014047402  (MUSC FOUNDATION FOR RES AND DEV [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *
by applicantUS8520925