Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3096675

EP3096675 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ELIMINATING IMAGE MOTION BLUR IN A MULTIPLE VIEWING ELEMENTS ENDOSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.10.2016
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2018Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EndoChoice, Inc.
11810 Wills Road
Alpharetta, GA 30009 / US
[2016/48]
Inventor(s)01 / DAVIDSON, Tal
4/1 Hermon Street
20692 Yokneam Ilit / IL
 [2016/48]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/48]O'Brien, Lisa
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date15740290.023.01.2015
[2016/48]
WO2015US12751
Priority number, dateUS201461931563P25.01.2014         Original published format: US 201461931563 P
[2016/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015112899
Date:30.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3096675
Date:30.11.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2015
[2016/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.07.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B1/06, A61B1/045
[2017/43]
Former International [2016/48]A61B1/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/48]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BESEITIGUNG VON BILDBEWEGUNGSUNSCHÄRFE IN EINEM ENDOSKOP MIT MEHREREN ANSICHTSELEMENTEN[2016/48]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ELIMINATING IMAGE MOTION BLUR IN A MULTIPLE VIEWING ELEMENTS ENDOSCOPE[2016/48]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR ÉLIMINER LE FLOU CINÉTIQUE D'IMAGE DANS UN ENDOSCOPE À MULTIPLES ÉLÉMENTS DE VISUALISATION[2016/48]
Entry into regional phase22.07.2016National basic fee paid 
22.07.2016Search fee paid 
22.07.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/48]
18.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US4740837  (YANAGISAWA TAKUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,14 * column 2, line 12 - line 41 * * column 4, line 30 - line 69 * * figures 2b, 2c, 4 * [Y] 4-6,11-13 [I] 7-10,15;
 [Y]US4953539  (NAKAMURA KAZUNARI [JP], et al) [Y] 4,5,11,12 * column 14, line 30 - line 38 * * figure 16 *;
 [Y]US5408263  (KIKUCHI KENICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 6,13 * column 37, line 1 - line 16 * * figure 46 *;
 [X]US4743966  (MATSUO SATOSHI [JP]) [X] 1 * figures 2, 4a, 4b *;
 [X]US2006184037  (INCE CAN [NL], et al) [X] 1 * figures 28-31 * * paragraphs [0150] - [0157] *
International search[X]US2006184037  (INCE CAN [NL], et al);
 [Y]US2002172498  (ESENYAN HAYK [US], et al);
 [Y]US2004133072  (KENNEDY BRUCE L [US]);
 [A]US2008183043  (SPINNLER KLAUS [DE], et al)
by applicantUS4740837