Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3169367 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3169367



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 409
18.06.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
09.05.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.04.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.04.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
25.04.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 7
25.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.01.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
14.01.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.01.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.01.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 78
14.01.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 78
10.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
10.07.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 10
10.07.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
10.07.2018 Description Search / examination 10
10.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.07.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.07.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
04.05.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
04.05.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.04.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
05.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.07.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
05.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
05.07.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
05.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.04.2017 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
23.02.2017 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
21.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.01.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
10.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.01.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
10.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
10.01.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
25.11.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.02.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 39
21.01.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.01.2016 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 80
22.09.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
22.09.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
22.09.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3