Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3169367


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.02.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.03.2020 [2020/13]
14.02.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2020 [2020/12]
07.02.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.03.2020 [2020/11]
31.01.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.03.2020 [2020/10]
24.01.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2020 [2020/09]
10.01.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.02.2020  [2020/07]
05.12.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.01.2020  [2020/01]
22.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2019  [2019/52]
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019  [2019/51]
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019  [2019/50]
01.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2019  [2019/49]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019  [2019/48]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
03.05.2019 (Expected) grant published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
01.05.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
01.05.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
26.04.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
13.01.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
07.12.2018 Change - classification published on  09.01.2019  [2019/02]
28.07.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.07.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.05.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.05.2018 First examination report
22.09.2017 Change: Validation states published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
22.09.2017 Change - extension states published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
21.07.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.07.2017 Amendment by applicant
21.04.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.05.2017  [2017/21]
21.04.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
21.04.2017 Request for examination filed published on  24.05.2017  [2017/21]
18.04.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
29.03.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
01.02.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
20.01.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
11.01.2017 Amendment by applicant
10.01.2017 Change - representative
10.01.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
26.01.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
22.01.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
18.09.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
03.08.2015 PCT data prior to European publication