Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3169367

EP3169367 - POLY(BETA-AMINO ESTER) CONJUGATES FOR CARTILAGE AGENT DELIVERY AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.05.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.04.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SM
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University College Cardiff Consultants Ltd
30-36 Newport Road
Cardiff
South Glamorgan
CF24 0DE / GB
[2017/21]
Inventor(s)01 / PROKOPOVICH, Polina
23 Grants Close
Tongwynlais
Cardiff South Glamorgan CF15 7NG / GB
02 / PERNI, Stefano
23 Grants Close
Tongwynlais
Cardiff South Glamorgan CF15 7NG / GB
 [2017/21]
Representative(s)Myint, Julie Marie
Symbiosis IP Limited
Basepoint Business Centre
Vale Business Park
Crab Apple Way, Evesham
Worcestershire WR11 1GP / GB
[2019/23]
Former [2017/21]Fyles, Julie Marie
Symbiosis IP Limited
Basepoint Business Centre
Vale Business Park
Crab Apple Way, Evesham
Worcestershire WR11 1GP / GB
Application number, filing date15741260.214.07.2015
[2017/21]
WO2015GB52028
Priority number, dateGB2014001261016.07.2014         Original published format: GB 201412610
[2017/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016009190
Date:21.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3169367
Date:24.05.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016
[2017/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3169367
Date:05.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61K47/59
[2019/02]
Former International [2017/21]A61K47/50
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/21]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLY(BETA-AMINOESTER)-KONJUGATE ZUR KNORPELWIRKSTOFFABGABE UND VERFAHREN[2017/21]
English:POLY(BETA-AMINO ESTER) CONJUGATES FOR CARTILAGE AGENT DELIVERY AND METHODS[2017/21]
French:CONJUGUÉS DE POLY(ESTER BÊTA-AMINO) POUR ADMINISTRATION D'UN AGENT CARTILAGINEUX ET PROCÉDÉS[2017/21]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2017National basic fee paid 
10.01.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/21]
10.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2019Fee for grant paid
25.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
17.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
SM05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
[2020/13]
Former [2020/12]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
IT05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
IS05.10.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/11]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
EE05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
SK05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/10]AL05.06.2019
AT05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RO05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
PT07.10.2019
Former [2020/09]AL05.06.2019
CZ05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2020/07]AL05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
NL05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2019/51]AL05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
BG05.09.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
LV05.06.2019
RS05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
GR06.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL05.06.2019
ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
HR05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
SE05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES05.06.2019
FI05.06.2019
LT05.06.2019
NO05.09.2019
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2014193508  (BAJPAYEE AMBIKA GOEL [US] ET AL) [X] 1-14,16,18-26,28,29 * paragraphs [0055] , [ 100] , [0065] , [0073] * [A] 15,17,27;
 [XA]WO2008011561  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]; ZUGATES GREGORY T [US]; ZUMBUEHL A) [X] 1-14,16,18-26,28,29 * paragraphs [0008] , [0124] * [A] 15,17,27;
 [XP]WO2014110353  (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US]) [XP] 1,16,24,28,29 * claims 1,3 *
ExaminationUS2014050671