Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3197527

EP3197527 - INHALER WITH ORIENTATION SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.04.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2019Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2017/31]
Inventor(s)01 / BALLAM, Robert Scott
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / GANTON, Robert Bruce
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/31]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/31]
Application number, filing date15742492.015.07.2015
[2017/31]
WO2015US40467
Priority number, dateUS201462053703P22.09.2014         Original published format: US 201462053703 P
US201562103954P15.01.2015         Original published format: US 201562103954 P
US20151479856014.07.2015         Original published format: US201514798560
[2017/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016048435
Date:31.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3197527
Date:02.08.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016
[2017/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61M15/00
[2017/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/31]
TitleGerman:INHALATOR MIT AUSRICHTUNGSSENSOR[2017/31]
English:INHALER WITH ORIENTATION SENSOR[2017/31]
French:INHALATEUR AVEC CAPTEUR D'ORIENTATION[2017/31]
Entry into regional phase16.02.2017National basic fee paid 
16.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
16.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/31]
01.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
11.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2014004437  (GECKO HEALTH INNOVATIONS INC [US]) [X] 1,8-10,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] , [0 84] - [0086] - [0 88] - [0090] - [0 75] * [I] 4,5,7;
 [XI]US2013269685  (WACHTEL HERBERT [DE] ET AL) [X] 1,3,8-10,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [00 5] , [00 7] , [00 9] , [0 14] , [0 61] - [0065] - [0 78] , [0 90] , [0093] , [ 97] , [ 100] , [ 103] * [I] 4,5,7;
 [XI]US8807131  (TUNNELL STEPHEN A [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,6,8-10,20 * abstract * * column 21, line 20 - column 22, line 44 * * column 28, lines 35-54 * * column 17, lines 1-23, 52-60 * [I] 4,5,7;
 [A]US2013008436  (VON HOLLEN DIRK ERNEST [US] ET AL) [A] 1-10,20 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2014068504  (SOUTH OSTRICH LTD [IL]) [A] 1-10,20 * the whole document *