Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3171912

EP3171912 - FLOW CONTROL APPARATUS COMPRISING DETECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.04.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Change - divisional application(s)published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KPR U.S., LLC
777 West Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
[2018/07]
Former [2017/22]For all designated states
Covidien LP
15 Hampshire Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BOULANGER, Jason
436 W. 4th Street
Trenton, IL 62293 / US
02 / HUDSON, Joseph
948 Amethyst Court
O'fallon, MO 63366 / US
03 / TRELFORD, Lester Paul
4600 Candleglow Drive
St. Louis, MO 63129 / US
 [2017/22]
Representative(s)Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[2019/47]
Former [2017/22]Olsson, Carl H.S.
Covidien AG
Victor von Bruns-Strasse 19
8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH
Application number, filing date15744457.122.07.2015
[2017/22]
WO2015US41510
Priority number, dateUS201462028983P25.07.2014         Original published format: US 201462028983 P
[2017/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016014651
Date:28.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3171912
Date:31.05.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2016
[2017/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3171912
Date:20.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/142, A61J15/00, A61M5/168, A61M5/36
[2017/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLUSSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG DETEKTIONSSYSTEM[2017/22]
English:FLOW CONTROL APPARATUS COMPRISING DETECTION SYSTEM[2017/22]
French:APPAREIL DE COMMANDE D'ÉCOULEMENT COMPRENANT UN SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION[2017/22]
Entry into regional phase19.01.2017National basic fee paid 
19.01.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
19.01.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/22]
19.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
31.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2019Fee for grant paid
10.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19210210.1
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]US2002151838  (BECK KENT F [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0015] , [0103]; figure 4 *;
 [A]US2004065143  (HUSHER FREDERICK K [US]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0043] *;
 [A]WO2009129884  (MIB GMBH MESSTECHNIK UND INDUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 1, lines 2-23 *;
 [A]EP1435511  (PTI TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0103] - [0106] *
ExaminationUS3553636