Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3215745

EP3215745 - PROTECTIVE GRILLE WITH IMPROVED EFFICIENCY AND NOISE CHARACTERISTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EBM-Papst Mulfingen GmbH&CO. KG
Bachmühle 2
74673 Mulfingen / DE
[2017/37]
Inventor(s)01 / STREHLE, Michael
Am Weinberg 8
74653 Ingelfingen / DE
02 / GRUBER, Erhard
Bölgentalerstrasse 7
74589 Satteldorf / DE
03 / MÜLLER, Jens
Eichenweg 2/1
74653 Künzelsau / DE
04 / VOGEL, Manuel
Am Römerbrunnen 1
74653 Jagsthausen / DE
 [2017/37]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/37]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date15745489.303.08.2015
[2017/37]
WO2015EP67821
Priority number, dateDE20141011604704.11.2014         Original published format: DE102014116047
[2017/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016071014
Date:12.05.2016
Language:DE
[2016/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3215745
Date:13.09.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2016
[2017/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:F04D29/54, F04D29/70, F24F13/08
[2017/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/37]
TitleGerman:SCHUTZGITTER MIT VERBESSERTEM WIRKUNGSGRAD- UND GERÄUSCHVERHALTEN[2017/37]
English:PROTECTIVE GRILLE WITH IMPROVED EFFICIENCY AND NOISE CHARACTERISTICS[2017/37]
French:GRILLE DE PROTECTION À COMPORTEMENT AMÉLIORÉ EN TERMES DE BRUIT ET D'EFFICACITÉ[2017/37]
Entry into regional phase02.02.2017National basic fee paid 
02.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
02.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/37]
02.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XAY]WO03054395  (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1,2,11,12 * page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 6, paragraph l - page 7, paragraph 3; figures 1,2 * * page 8, paragraph l * [A] 4 [Y] 2,8-10;
 [E]WO2015124237  (EBM PAPST ST GEORGEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [E] 1,2,8,9,11,12 * page 15, paragraph 2 * * page 16, paragraph 3 * * page 18, paragraph 2; figure 4 * * page 19, paragraph 3; figure 8 *;
 [YA]DE202009017511U  (EBM PAPST MULFINGEN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 9,10 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018]; figure 1 * [A] 1;
 [YA]US6071079  (LITVIN CHARLES [US]) [Y] 2,8 * column 2, line 17 - line 45; figure 2 * [A] 1,5-7;
 [A]DE102005019421  (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,3,5-7 * paragraph [0021]; figure 1 *